Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Limited Liability Companies

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0357
Title
Income Tax - Pass-Through Entity - Additional Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0691
Title
Election Law – Campaign Contributors – Disclosure of Owning or Controlling Individual or Business Entity
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0779
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839 /CH0335
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Lists of Business Entities Not Filing Annual Report
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0880)
Title
Income Tax – Pass–Through Entities – State and Local Taxes
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0335 /CH0428
Title
Courts – Nongovernmental Corporate Parties – Disclosure Statements
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0039 (HB0612)
Title
Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0880 (HB1087)
Title
Income Tax – Pass–Through Entities – State and Local Taxes
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0357 Income Tax - Pass-Through Entity - Additional Tax Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0691 Election Law – Campaign Contributors – Disclosure of Owning or Controlling Individual or Business Entity Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0779 Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0839 /CH0335 State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Lists of Business Entities Not Filing Annual Report Delegate Qi 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1087 (SB0880) Income Tax – Pass–Through Entities – State and Local Taxes Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Ways and Means
SB0335 /CH0428 Courts – Nongovernmental Corporate Parties – Disclosure Statements Senator Sydnor 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 428
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0496 /CH0039 (HB0612) Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0880 (HB1087) Income Tax – Pass–Through Entities – State and Local Taxes Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:00 PM
Click to return on the top page