Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Liens

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0517 /CH0441 (SB0319)
Title
Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0565 /CH0770 (SB0514/CH0769)
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0742 /CH0077 (SB0014/CH0076)
Title
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0852 /CH0382
Title
Property Tax - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1050
Title
Tax Sales – Notices
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1221
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water and Sewer Liens
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0014 /CH0076 (HB0742/CH0077)
Title
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0319 (HB0517/CH0441)
Title
Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0457 (HB1196)
Title
Commercial Law – Credit Regulation – Reverse Mortgage Loans Act – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0514 /CH0769 (HB0565/CH0770)
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0517 /CH0441 (SB0319) Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency Delegate Watson, C. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 441
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0565 /CH0770 (SB0514/CH0769) Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 770
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0742 /CH0077 (SB0014/CH0076) Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act) Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Judiciary
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0852 /CH0382 Property Tax - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 382
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1050 Tax Sales – Notices Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1221 Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water and Sewer Liens Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0014 /CH0076 (HB0742/CH0077) Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act) Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0319 (HB0517/CH0441) Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency Senator Hester 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (108-28)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0457 (HB1196) Commercial Law – Credit Regulation – Reverse Mortgage Loans Act – Revisions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0514 /CH0769 (HB0565/CH0770) Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 769
Finance
2/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:52 AM
Click to return on the top page