Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislative Policy Committee

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0956
Title
Public-Private Partnership (P3) Oversight and Accountability Act
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1188 (SB0982/CH0497)
Title
Information Technology - Modernization of Information Technology Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1244 /CH0963 (SB1022)
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Academic Program Approval and Institutional Mission Statements - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1416 (SB0618)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Creation of Pimlico Site Community Development Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1524 /CH0410
Title
Horse Racing - Racing Facility Ownership and Construction - Racing Operations
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0618 (HB1416)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Creation of Pimlico Site Master Plan
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0956 Public-Private Partnership (P3) Oversight and Accountability Act Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1188 (SB0982/CH0497) Information Technology - Modernization of Information Technology Projects Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Budget and Taxation
HB1244 /CH0963 (SB1022) Maryland Higher Education Commission - Academic Program Approval and Institutional Mission Statements - Requirements Delegate Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 963
Appropriations
2/27/2024 - 12:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1416 (SB0618) Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Creation of Pimlico Site Community Development Plan Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
3/19/2024 - 1:30 PM
HB1524 /CH0410 Horse Racing - Racing Facility Ownership and Construction - Racing Operations Chair, Ways and Means Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Ways and Means
3/19/2024 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
SB0618 (HB1416) Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Creation of Pimlico Site Master Plan Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
4/05/2024 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:48 PM
Click to return on the top page