Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislative Policy Committee

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0835
Title
States of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Renewals - Authorization by General Assembly or Legislative Policy Committee
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0935 (SB0640)
Title
Emergency Community Services Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1034
Title
Prescription Drug Affordability Board - Plan of Action - Repeal of Date for Submission
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 (HB0935)
Title
Emergency Community Services Fund
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0929
Title
States of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Renewals - Authorization by Legislative Policy Committee
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0835 States of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Renewals - Authorization by General Assembly or Legislative Policy Committee Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0935 (SB0640) Emergency Community Services Fund Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1034 Prescription Drug Affordability Board - Plan of Action - Repeal of Date for Submission Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0640 (HB0935) Emergency Community Services Fund Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0929 States of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Renewals - Authorization by Legislative Policy Committee Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 8:02 PM
Click to return on the top page