Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Leave

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0056 /CH0573 (SB0473/CH0574)
Title
Labor and Employment – Leave With Pay – Bereavement Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0278
Title
Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Qualified Position and Revitalization Area
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0350
Title
Labor and Employment – Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Verification
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0375 (SB0211)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007 /CH0164 (SB0810)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1326 (SB0727)
Title
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Revisions and Public Health Emergency Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0211 (HB0375)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0473 /CH0574 (HB0056/CH0573)
Title
Labor and Employment - Leave With Pay - Bereavement Leave
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0594
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Verification
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0727 (HB1326)
Title
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Revisions and Public Health Emergency Leave
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0810 (HB1007/CH0164)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0914 /CH0522
Title
Sheriff of Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0056 /CH0573 (SB0473/CH0574) Labor and Employment – Leave With Pay – Bereavement Leave Delegate Boyce 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573
Economic Matters
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0278 Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Qualified Position and Revitalization Area Delegate Feldmark 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0350 Labor and Employment – Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Verification Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0375 (SB0211) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB1007 /CH0164 (SB0810) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164
Economic Matters
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1326 (SB0727) Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Revisions and Public Health Emergency Leave Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0211 (HB0375) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021) Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/28/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0473 /CH0574 (HB0056/CH0573) Labor and Employment - Leave With Pay - Bereavement Leave Senator Washington 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 574
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0594 Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Verification Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0727 (HB1326) Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Revisions and Public Health Emergency Leave Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0810 (HB1007/CH0164) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0914 /CH0522 Sheriff of Baltimore City Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 522
Finance
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:19 AM
Click to return on the top page