Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Land Records -see also- Deeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0013 /CH0287 (SB0199/CH0288)
Title
Residential Property - Affordable Housing Land Trusts - Authority to Establish Condominium Regimes
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054 /CH0771
Title
Property Tax - Transfer to Heir or Legatee - Payment Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0226 (SB0269)
Title
Property Tax Credit - Permanent Supportive Housing - Established
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0480 (SB0664)
Title
Real Property - Land Installment Contracts - Requirements and Vendor Duties and Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Taylor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0591
Title
Real Property - Transfer to Heir or Legatee - Exemption From Payment
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0616 (SB0392)
Title
Agricultural Land - Adversarial Foreign Governments - Restrictions on Property Interests
Sponsor
Delegate Munoz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664 /CH0414 (SB0575/CH0415)
Title
Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0989 /CH0695
Title
Montgomery County – Subdivision Plats – Conditions PG/MC 111–24
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003 /CH0696
Title
Montgomery County - Clerk of the Circuit Court - Plat Recordation PG/MC 110-24
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196 (SB0962)
Title
Real Property - Contracts of Sale - Title Report Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1324
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Eligible Properties - Alteration
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1419
Title
Criminal Law - Deed Fraud - Prohibition and Deed Fraud Prevention Grant Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1511 /CH0457
Title
Forest Conservation Act – Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0199 /CH0288 (HB0013/CH0287)
Title
Residential Property - Affordable Housing Land Trusts - Authority to Establish Condominium Regimes
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0269 (HB0226)
Title
Property Tax Credit - Permanent Supportive Housing - Established
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0392 (HB0616)
Title
Agricultural Land - Adversarial Foreign Governments - Restrictions on Property Interests
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0423 /CH0362
Title
Real Property - Recordation - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0575 /CH0415 (HB0664/CH0414)
Title
Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act)
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664 (HB0480)
Title
Real Property - Land Installment Contracts - Requirements and Vendor Duties and Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0962 (HB1196)
Title
Real Property – Contracts of Sale – Title Report Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0013 /CH0287 (SB0199/CH0288) Residential Property - Affordable Housing Land Trusts - Authority to Establish Condominium Regimes Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2024 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0054 /CH0771 Property Tax - Transfer to Heir or Legatee - Payment Plans Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771
Ways and Means
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0226 (SB0269) Property Tax Credit - Permanent Supportive Housing - Established Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0480 (SB0664) Real Property - Land Installment Contracts - Requirements and Vendor Duties and Limitations Delegate Taylor 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0591 Real Property - Transfer to Heir or Legatee - Exemption From Payment Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0616 (SB0392) Agricultural Land - Adversarial Foreign Governments - Restrictions on Property Interests Delegate Munoz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0664 /CH0414 (SB0575/CH0415) Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act) Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Judiciary
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0989 /CH0695 Montgomery County – Subdivision Plats – Conditions PG/MC 111–24 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 695
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1003 /CH0696 Montgomery County - Clerk of the Circuit Court - Plat Recordation PG/MC 110-24 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 696
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1196 (SB0962) Real Property - Contracts of Sale - Title Report Requirement Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1324 Homestead Property Tax Credit - Eligible Properties - Alteration Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1419 Criminal Law - Deed Fraud - Prohibition and Deed Fraud Prevention Grant Fund Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1511 /CH0457 Forest Conservation Act – Modifications Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2024 - 3:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0199 /CH0288 (HB0013/CH0287) Residential Property - Affordable Housing Land Trusts - Authority to Establish Condominium Regimes Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0269 (HB0226) Property Tax Credit - Permanent Supportive Housing - Established Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
SB0392 (HB0616) Agricultural Land - Adversarial Foreign Governments - Restrictions on Property Interests Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0423 /CH0362 Real Property - Recordation - Procedures Senator James 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0575 /CH0415 (HB0664/CH0414) Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act) Senator Corderman 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0664 (HB0480) Real Property - Land Installment Contracts - Requirements and Vendor Duties and Limitations Senator Charles 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2024 - 10:00 AM
SB0962 (HB1196) Real Property – Contracts of Sale – Title Report Requirement Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:38 PM
Click to return on the top page