Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Laboratories

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0109 /CH0265 (SB0242/CH0266)
Title
Maryland Department of Health – System for Newborn Screening – Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0250
Title
Private Well Safety Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0351 (SB0333)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0361 (SB0320)
Title
Mold Inspections and Remediation - Standards, Reporting, Penalties, and Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0407 (SB0407)
Title
Health Occupations - Health Care Staffing Shortage Emergency - Declaration and Licensing and Practice Requirements (Health Care Heroes Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0570
Title
Pesticides – Mosquito Control Products and PFAS Chemicals
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0654
Title
Back River and Patapsco Wastewater Treatment Plants - Water Quality Testing and Overflow and Pipeline Breakage Notification (Environmental Accountability Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866 /CH0501 (SB0766)
Title
Genetic Information Privacy - Consumer Protection and Forensic Genealogy
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1266
Title
Dentists - Saliva Lead Poisoning Screening Tests - Scope of Practice and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1290 /CH0032
Title
Education - Public School Construction - Funding and Administration
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1478
Title
Hemp Farming Program - Use of Hemp and Hemp Products in Consumable Products
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0320 (HB0361)
Title
Mold Inspections and Remediation - Standards, Reporting, Penalties, and Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0333 (HB0351)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0407 (HB0407)
Title
Health Occupations - Health Care Staffing Shortage Emergency - Declaration and Licensing and Practice Requirements (Health Care Heroes Act of 2022)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0634
Title
Health Insurance – Home Test Kits for Sexually Transmitted Diseases – Required Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0766 (HB0866/CH0501)
Title
Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Genetic Information Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0945 (HB0869/CH0465)
Title
Wetlands and Waterways Program Division - Permitting for Ecological Restoration Projects - Required Study
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1006
Title
Hemp Farming Program - Use of Hemp and Hemp Products in Consumable Products
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0109 /CH0265 (SB0242/CH0266) Maryland Department of Health – System for Newborn Screening – Requirements Delegate Shetty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 265
Health and Government Operations
1/19/2022 - 2:50 PM
Finance
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0250 Private Well Safety Act of 2022 Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Hester) Adopted
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0351 (SB0333) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0361 (SB0320) Mold Inspections and Remediation - Standards, Reporting, Penalties, and Tax Credit Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0407 (SB0407) Health Occupations - Health Care Staffing Shortage Emergency - Declaration and Licensing and Practice Requirements (Health Care Heroes Act of 2022) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0570 Pesticides – Mosquito Control Products and PFAS Chemicals Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0654 Back River and Patapsco Wastewater Treatment Plants - Water Quality Testing and Overflow and Pipeline Breakage Notification (Environmental Accountability Act of 2022) Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0866 /CH0501 (SB0766) Genetic Information Privacy - Consumer Protection and Forensic Genealogy Delegate Qi 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 501
Economic Matters
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1266 Dentists - Saliva Lead Poisoning Screening Tests - Scope of Practice and Requirements Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB1290 /CH0032 Education - Public School Construction - Funding and Administration Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 32
Appropriations
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1478 Hemp Farming Program - Use of Hemp and Hemp Products in Consumable Products Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
SB0320 (HB0361) Mold Inspections and Remediation - Standards, Reporting, Penalties, and Tax Credit Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0333 (HB0351) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0407 (HB0407) Health Occupations - Health Care Staffing Shortage Emergency - Declaration and Licensing and Practice Requirements (Health Care Heroes Act of 2022) President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0634 Health Insurance – Home Test Kits for Sexually Transmitted Diseases – Required Coverage Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0692 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0766 (HB0866/CH0501) Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Genetic Information Privacy Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0833 Cannabis Reform Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0945 (HB0869/CH0465) Wetlands and Waterways Program Division - Permitting for Ecological Restoration Projects - Required Study Senator Gallion 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1006 Hemp Farming Program - Use of Hemp and Hemp Products in Consumable Products Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/27/2022 8:04 AM
Click to return on the top page