Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Labeling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133 /CH0709 (SB0372/CH0710)
Title
Environment - Sealant Products - Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560
Title
Public Safety - Consumer and Display Fireworks
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0700
Title
Environment – Products and Packaging – Labeling, Marketing, and Advertising for Recycling
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1239
Title
Environment - Plastic and Glass Products - Postconsumer Recycled Content Program
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0372 /CH0710 (HB0133/CH0709)
Title
Environment - Sealant Products - Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0133 /CH0709 (SB0372/CH0710) Environment - Sealant Products - Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2022) Delegate Stewart 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 709
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0560 Public Safety - Consumer and Display Fireworks Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0700 Environment – Products and Packaging – Labeling, Marketing, and Advertising for Recycling Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2022 - 11:00 AM
Economic Matters
HB1239 Environment - Plastic and Glass Products - Postconsumer Recycled Content Program Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
Economic Matters
HB1342 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0372 /CH0710 (HB0133/CH0709) Environment - Sealant Products - Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2022) Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 710
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0692 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0833 Cannabis Reform Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:25 PM
Click to return on the top page