Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Municipalities (L3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0042
Title
Municipal Incorporation – County Commissioners or County Council – Required Consideration of Referendum Request
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0093
Title
Candidates for Offices of Municipalities and Common Ownership Communities - Reports of Donations and Disbursements
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0323
Title
Real Property - Limitations on Summoning Law Enforcement or Emergency Services - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0381 (SB0368)
Title
Municipalities – Charter Amendments – Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528 /CH0599
Title
Town of Williamsport (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0543 /CH0600
Title
Town of Hancock (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0572 (SB0486)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0732 (SB0096)
Title
Community Parks and Playgrounds Program - Charles County - Basketball Courts
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0096 (HB0732)
Title
Community Parks and Playgrounds Program - Charles County - Basketball Courts
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0368 (HB0381)
Title
Municipalities - Charter Amendments - Notice
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0572)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0042 Municipal Incorporation – County Commissioners or County Council – Required Consideration of Referendum Request Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0093 Candidates for Offices of Municipalities and Common Ownership Communities - Reports of Donations and Disbursements Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0323 Real Property - Limitations on Summoning Law Enforcement or Emergency Services - Prohibition Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0381 (SB0368) Municipalities – Charter Amendments – Notice Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0528 /CH0599 Town of Williamsport (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance Delegate McKay 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 599
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0543 /CH0600 Town of Hancock (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance Delegate McKay 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 600
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0572 (SB0486) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0732 (SB0096) Community Parks and Playgrounds Program - Charles County - Basketball Courts Delegate Patterson 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
SB0096 (HB0732) Community Parks and Playgrounds Program - Charles County - Basketball Courts Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0368 (HB0381) Municipalities - Charter Amendments - Notice Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0486 (HB0572) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:14 PM
Click to return on the top page