Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Counties - Generally (L1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0017 /CH0090 (SB0274/CH0089)
Title
Charter Counties - Comprehensive Plans - Affirmatively Furthering Fair Housing
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0081
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Form of County Government - Requirement to Adopt Charter Home Rule
Sponsor
Delegate Bouchat
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372 /CH0294 (SB0354/CH0295)
Title
Montgomery County and Prince George's County - Rent Court Workforce Solutions Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Harris
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0501 /CH0811 (SB0522/CH0810)
Title
Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Laws
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0805 /CH0244 (SB0537)
Title
Cannabis - Licensee Locations - Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940 (SB1170)
Title
Local Government - Authorized Uses of Revenues From Development Impact Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0944
Title
Cecil County and Harford County - Outdoor Seating at Restaurants, Breweries, and Bars
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0989 /CH0695
Title
Montgomery County – Subdivision Plats – Conditions PG/MC 111–24
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003 /CH0696
Title
Montgomery County - Clerk of the Circuit Court - Plat Recordation PG/MC 110-24
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1321 /CH0675
Title
Land Use - Southern Maryland Code Counties - Subdivision Regulations - Property Dedication and Fee
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1328 (SB1082)
Title
Solar Energy and Energy Storage - Development and State Procurement
Sponsor
Delegate Ziegler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1436
Title
Municipal Incorporation - County Commissioners or County Council - Required Approval of Referendum Request
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0157
Title
Domestic Animals - Penalties for Abandonment and Microchip Requirements for Dogs
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0200
Title
Counties - Construction of Sidewalks and Crosswalks - Safe Alternative Routes to Public Schools
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 /CH0089 (HB0017/CH0090)
Title
Charter Counties - Comprehensive Plans - Affirmatively Furthering Fair Housing
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0354 /CH0295 (HB0372/CH0294)
Title
Montgomery County and Prince George's County - Rent Court Workforce Solutions Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0522 /CH0810 (HB0501/CH0811)
Title
Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Laws
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0537 (HB0805/CH0244)
Title
Cannabis - Licensee Locations - Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0866
Title
Health - Small Halfway Houses and Small Private Group Homes - County Zoning
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1082 (HB1328)
Title
Solar Energy and Energy Storage - Development and State Procurement
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1170 (HB0940)
Title
Local Government – Authorized Uses of Revenues From Development Impact Fees
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0017 /CH0090 (SB0274/CH0089) Charter Counties - Comprehensive Plans - Affirmatively Furthering Fair Housing Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2024 - 1:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0081 Constitutional Amendment - Form of County Government - Requirement to Adopt Charter Home Rule Delegate Bouchat 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2024 - 1:30 PM
HB0372 /CH0294 (SB0354/CH0295) Montgomery County and Prince George's County - Rent Court Workforce Solutions Pilot Program Delegate Harris 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Judiciary
2/21/2024 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0501 /CH0811 (SB0522/CH0810) Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Laws Delegate Fennell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 811
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0805 /CH0244 (SB0537) Cannabis - Licensee Locations - Restrictions Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Economic Matters
2/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0940 (SB1170) Local Government - Authorized Uses of Revenues From Development Impact Fees Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0944 Cecil County and Harford County - Outdoor Seating at Restaurants, Breweries, and Bars Delegate Griffith 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB0989 /CH0695 Montgomery County – Subdivision Plats – Conditions PG/MC 111–24 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 695
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1003 /CH0696 Montgomery County - Clerk of the Circuit Court - Plat Recordation PG/MC 110-24 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 696
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1321 /CH0675 Land Use - Southern Maryland Code Counties - Subdivision Regulations - Property Dedication and Fee Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 675
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1328 (SB1082) Solar Energy and Energy Storage - Development and State Procurement Delegate Ziegler 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1436 Municipal Incorporation - County Commissioners or County Council - Required Approval of Referendum Request Delegate Johnson, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0157 Domestic Animals - Penalties for Abandonment and Microchip Requirements for Dogs Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2024 - 2:30 PM
SB0200 Counties - Construction of Sidewalks and Crosswalks - Safe Alternative Routes to Public Schools Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0274 /CH0089 (HB0017/CH0090) Charter Counties - Comprehensive Plans - Affirmatively Furthering Fair Housing Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/25/2024 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0354 /CH0295 (HB0372/CH0294) Montgomery County and Prince George's County - Rent Court Workforce Solutions Pilot Program Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 295
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0522 /CH0810 (HB0501/CH0811) Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Laws Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 810
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0537 (HB0805/CH0244) Cannabis - Licensee Locations - Restrictions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Finance
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0866 Health - Small Halfway Houses and Small Private Group Homes - County Zoning Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB1082 (HB1328) Solar Energy and Energy Storage - Development and State Procurement Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB1170 (HB0940) Local Government – Authorized Uses of Revenues From Development Impact Fees Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:40 PM
Click to return on the top page