Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Kinship -see also- Parents and Guardians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0004 /CH0363 (SB0543)
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Admissions Standards - Prohibition on Consideration of Legacy Preference or Donor Preference
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0010
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Eligible Individuals and Direct Reimbursement for Mental Health Services
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Income Tax - Caregiver Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Harrison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0079
Title
Family Law – Child Custody – Determinations
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0231 /CH0024 (SB0275/CH0025)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Gold Star and Next of Kin Families
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0527
Title
Legacy Admissions
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0613 /CH0518
Title
Natural Resources - Recreational Catching of Oysters or Clams - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0833 /CH0371
Title
Parents in Substance Use Disorder Treatment - Children in Need of Assistance and Treatment Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0848 (SB0327)
Title
Family Law - Child Custody - Determinations
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1071
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Alston
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1310
Title
Baltimore City Coordinated Youth Violence Review and Response Team
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1344
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1453
Title
Foster Care Families Child Care Assistance Program and Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1499 (SB0708/CH0429)
Title
Family Law - Kinship Care
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0202 /CH0161
Title
Department of Aging - Caregiver Expense Grant Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 /CH0025 (HB0231/CH0024)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Gold Star and Next of Kin Families
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0327 (HB0848)
Title
Family Law - Child Custody - Determinations
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0543 (HB0004/CH0363)
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Admissions Standards - Prohibition on Consideration of Legacy Preference or Donor Preference
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708 /CH0429 (HB1499)
Title
Family Law - Kinship Care
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1180
Title
Criminal Law - Threats Against Government Officials and Employees - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0004 /CH0363 (SB0543) Institutions of Higher Education - Admissions Standards - Prohibition on Consideration of Legacy Preference or Donor Preference Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Appropriations
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0010 Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Eligible Individuals and Direct Reimbursement for Mental Health Services Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB0032 Income Tax - Caregiver Tax Credit Delegate Harrison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0079 Family Law – Child Custody – Determinations Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB0231 /CH0024 (SB0275/CH0025) Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Gold Star and Next of Kin Families Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 24
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0527 Legacy Admissions Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB0613 /CH0518 Natural Resources - Recreational Catching of Oysters or Clams - Requirements Delegate Boyce 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0833 /CH0371 Parents in Substance Use Disorder Treatment - Children in Need of Assistance and Treatment Facilities Delegate Williams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Judiciary
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0848 (SB0327) Family Law - Child Custody - Determinations Delegate McComas 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1071 Family Law - Grandparent Visitation Delegate Alston 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB1310 Baltimore City Coordinated Youth Violence Review and Response Team Delegate Attar 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1344 Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1453 Foster Care Families Child Care Assistance Program and Fund - Establishment Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB1499 (SB0708/CH0429) Family Law - Kinship Care Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
3/12/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0202 /CH0161 Department of Aging - Caregiver Expense Grant Program - Established Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Budget and Taxation
1/17/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0275 /CH0025 (HB0231/CH0024) Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Gold Star and Next of Kin Families Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 25
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0327 (HB0848) Family Law - Child Custody - Determinations Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0543 (HB0004/CH0363) Institutions of Higher Education - Admissions Standards - Prohibition on Consideration of Legacy Preference or Donor Preference Senator Brooks 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0708 /CH0429 (HB1499) Family Law - Kinship Care Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1180 Criminal Law - Threats Against Government Officials and Employees - Expansion Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/15/2024 2:26 PM
Click to return on the top page