Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Unemployment Insurance (K2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0004
Title
Unemployment Insurance – Recovery of Benefits – Refund of Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0234
Title
Unemployment Insurance – Notice of Earned Income Tax Credits for Unemployment Insurance Claimants
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0253 (SB0655)
Title
Unemployment Insurance – Federal Extended Benefits for Long–Term Unemployment
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0901
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Disqualification Exceptions - COVID-19 Vaccination
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0955
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Procedures for Recovery of Overpayment of Benefits - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1454 (SB0985)
Title
Labor and Employment - Unemployment Insurance Violations - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0635
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Appeals and Recovery of Overpayment of Benefits Procedures - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0655 (HB0253)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Federal Extended Benefits for Long-Term Unemployment
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0827
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Computation of Earned Rate of Contribution - Applicable Table of Rates
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0985 (HB1454)
Title
Labor and Employment - Unemployment Insurance - Duties of Secretary and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0004 Unemployment Insurance – Recovery of Benefits – Refund of Payments Delegate Watson 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
Finance
3/23/2022 - 1:15 PM
HB0234 Unemployment Insurance – Notice of Earned Income Tax Credits for Unemployment Insurance Claimants Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0253 (SB0655) Unemployment Insurance – Federal Extended Benefits for Long–Term Unemployment Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0901 Unemployment Insurance - Disqualification Exceptions - COVID-19 Vaccination Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0955 Unemployment Insurance - Procedures for Recovery of Overpayment of Benefits - Alterations Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1454 (SB0985) Labor and Employment - Unemployment Insurance Violations - Penalties Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0635 Unemployment Insurance - Appeals and Recovery of Overpayment of Benefits Procedures - Revisions Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0655 (HB0253) Unemployment Insurance - Federal Extended Benefits for Long-Term Unemployment Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0827 Unemployment Insurance - Computation of Earned Rate of Contribution - Applicable Table of Rates Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0985 (HB1454) Labor and Employment - Unemployment Insurance - Duties of Secretary and Penalties Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
3/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/8/2022 2:41 PM
Click to return on the top page