Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Workers' Compensation (K1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0085 /CH0199 (SB0651/CH0200)
Title
Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0683 (SB0461)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Cannabis - Compensation and Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0765
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – Novel Coronavirus (Essential Workers’ Compensation Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0876
Title
Uninsured Employers' Fund and Subsequent Injury Fund - Amount of Assessment on Awards and Settlements - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1199 (SB0813)
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1247 (SB0725)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461 (HB0683)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Cannabis - Compensation and Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0651 /CH0200 (HB0085/CH0199)
Title
Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725 (HB1247)
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0756
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0812
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813 (HB1199)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0860
Title
Workers' Compensation - COVID-19 Occupational Disease Presumption - Public School Employees
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0951
Title
Labor and Employment – Workers’ Compensation Claims – Fees for Legal Services
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0085 /CH0199 (SB0651/CH0200) Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers Delegate Bhandari 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Economic Matters
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0683 (SB0461) Workers' Compensation - Medical Cannabis - Compensation and Benefits Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0765 Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – Novel Coronavirus (Essential Workers’ Compensation Act) Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB0876 Uninsured Employers' Fund and Subsequent Injury Fund - Amount of Assessment on Awards and Settlements - Sunset Extension Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1199 (SB0813) Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19 Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1247 (SB0725) Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19 Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0461 (HB0683) Workers' Compensation - Medical Cannabis - Compensation and Benefits Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0651 /CH0200 (HB0085/CH0199) Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0725 (HB1247) Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19 Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0756 Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19 Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0812 Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19 Senator Klausmeier 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0813 (HB1199) Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19 Senator Klausmeier 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0860 Workers' Compensation - COVID-19 Occupational Disease Presumption - Public School Employees Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0951 Labor and Employment – Workers’ Compensation Claims – Fees for Legal Services Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:39 PM
Click to return on the top page