Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Juvenile Facilities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0121
Title
Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Training Facilities With an Outdoor Firearm Range - Location
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0222 /CH0099 (SB0251/CH0100)
Title
Correctional Services - Division of Pretrial Detention and Services - Facilities
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0814 /CH0735 (SB0744)
Title
Juvenile Law - Reform
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855
Title
Juvenile Law - Restrictive Housing - Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1359
Title
Facilities - Disabilities and Juveniles - Community Relations Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0251 /CH0100 (HB0222/CH0099)
Title
Correctional Services - Division of Pretrial Detention and Services - Facilities
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0636
Title
Juvenile Law – Commission to Study the Ability of the Department of Juvenile Services to Provide Effective Social Services to Juvenile Offenders
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0744 (HB0814/CH0735)
Title
Juvenile Law - Reform
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0121 Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Training Facilities With an Outdoor Firearm Range - Location Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB0222 /CH0099 (SB0251/CH0100) Correctional Services - Division of Pretrial Detention and Services - Facilities Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Judiciary
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0814 /CH0735 (SB0744) Juvenile Law - Reform Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 735
Judiciary
2/08/2024 - 12:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0855 Juvenile Law - Restrictive Housing - Limitations Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1359 Facilities - Disabilities and Juveniles - Community Relations Plans Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
SB0251 /CH0100 (HB0222/CH0099) Correctional Services - Division of Pretrial Detention and Services - Facilities Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0636 Juvenile Law – Commission to Study the Ability of the Department of Juvenile Services to Provide Effective Social Services to Juvenile Offenders Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0744 (HB0814/CH0735) Juvenile Law - Reform President 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2024 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:37 PM
Click to return on the top page