Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Juries -see also- Grand Juries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0074 (SB0030)
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0208 /CH0545 (SB0775/CH0546)
Title
Courts - Payment for Jury Service
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1408 (SB0758)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Live Video Streaming of Public Proceedings
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0030 (HB0074)
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0605
Title
Medical Malpractice – Collateral Sources
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 (HB1408)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Live Video Streaming of Public Proceedings (The Judicial Transparency Act 2.0)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0775 /CH0546 (HB0208/CH0545)
Title
Courts - Payment for Jury Service
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0074 (SB0030) Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0208 /CH0545 (SB0775/CH0546) Courts - Payment for Jury Service Delegate Moon 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 545
Judiciary
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1408 (SB0758) Criminal Procedure – Live Video Streaming of Public Proceedings Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0030 (HB0074) Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0605 Medical Malpractice – Collateral Sources Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0758 (HB1408) Criminal Procedure - Live Video Streaming of Public Proceedings (The Judicial Transparency Act 2.0) Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0775 /CH0546 (HB0208/CH0545) Courts - Payment for Jury Service Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 546
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:11 PM
Click to return on the top page