Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Juries -see also- Grand Juries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0260 (SB0625)
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0899 (SB0670/CH0598)
Title
Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0902 (SB0669/CH0809)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0039
Title
Department of Planning - Collateral Consequences for Individuals With Criminal Records - Study
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0625 (HB0260)
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0669 /CH0809 (HB0902)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670 /CH0598 (HB0899)
Title
Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0260 (SB0625) Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (37-10)
Judiciary
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0899 (SB0670/CH0598) Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0902 (SB0669/CH0809) Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Rules
SB0039 Department of Planning - Collateral Consequences for Individuals With Criminal Records - Study Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0625 (HB0260) Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 10:00 AM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0669 /CH0809 (HB0902) Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 809
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0670 /CH0598 (HB0899) Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:52 AM
Click to return on the top page