Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Judicial Review -see also- Appeals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0076 /CH0618 (SB0334/CH0619)
Title
Water Pollution Control – Intervention in Civil Actions – Rights and Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0253
Title
Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0367
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0375 (SB0211)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385 (SB0395)
Title
Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0502 (SB0456)
Title
Office of the State’s Attorney – Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0758 /CH0462 (SB0684/CH0463)
Title
Maryland Licensure of Certified Midwives Act
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0211 (HB0375)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0334 /CH0619 (HB0076/CH0618)
Title
Water Pollution Control - Intervention in Civil Actions - Rights and Authority
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0395 (HB0385)
Title
Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0456 (HB0502)
Title
Office of the State's Attorney - Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0684 /CH0463 (HB0758/CH0462)
Title
Maryland Licensure of Certified Midwives Act
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0076 /CH0618 (SB0334/CH0619) Water Pollution Control – Intervention in Civil Actions – Rights and Authority Delegate Love 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 618
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0253 Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2021 - 1:45 PM
HB0367 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0375 (SB0211) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0385 (SB0395) Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0502 (SB0456) Office of the State’s Attorney – Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB0758 /CH0462 (SB0684/CH0463) Maryland Licensure of Certified Midwives Act Delegate Bagnall 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 462
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0211 (HB0375) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021) Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/28/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0334 /CH0619 (HB0076/CH0618) Water Pollution Control - Intervention in Civil Actions - Rights and Authority Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 619
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
SB0395 (HB0385) Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 12:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2021 - 12:30 PM
SB0456 (HB0502) Office of the State's Attorney - Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0684 /CH0463 (HB0758/CH0462) Maryland Licensure of Certified Midwives Act Senator Lam 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 463
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:17 PM
Click to return on the top page