Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Interstate Affairs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0034 (SB0204)
Title
Interstate Social Work Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0146 /CH0032 (SB0221/CH0033)
Title
Health Occupations Boards – Reciprocal Licensure and Certification
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 /CH0737 (SB0287/CH0738)
Title
Department of State Police - Professional Occupations - Application Process
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0250 /CH0422
Title
Financial Institutions - Third-Party Service Providers - Examinations
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0252 /CH0121
Title
Insurance - Holding Companies - Group Capital Calculation and Liquidity Stress Test
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0273
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0383 /CH0328 (SB0027/CH0329)
Title
Cosmetology Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0425 (SB0359)
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0454 /CH0728 (SB0679)
Title
Disclosure of Tax Information - Tax Compliance Activity and Binding Data Use Agreements
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0628 /CH0045 (SB0409/CH0046)
Title
Health Occupations - Clinical Marriage and Family Therapists - Reciprocal Licensure Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007 (SB0766)
Title
Fair Share for Maryland Act of 2024
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1319
Title
Internet Gaming - Authorization and Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0009
Title
United States of America - District of Columbia - Statehood
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0027 /CH0329 (HB0383/CH0328)
Title
Cosmetology Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0204 (HB0034)
Title
Interstate Social Work Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0221 /CH0033 (HB0146/CH0032)
Title
Health Occupations Boards – Reciprocal Licensure and Certification
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0287 /CH0738 (HB0172/CH0737)
Title
Department of State Police - Professional Occupations - Application Process
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0359 (HB0425)
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0409 /CH0046 (HB0628/CH0045)
Title
Health Occupations - Clinical Marriage and Family Therapists - Reciprocal Licensure Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0603
Title
Internet Gaming - Authorization and Implementation
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0627
Title
Horse Racing - Satellite Simulcast Betting - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0679 (HB0454/CH0728)
Title
Disclosure of Tax Information - Tax Compliance Activity and Binding Data Use Agreements
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0766 (HB1007)
Title
Fair Share for Maryland Act of 2024
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1070
Title
Financial Institutions - Heritage Areas - Canal Place
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0034 (SB0204) Interstate Social Work Licensure Compact Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0146 /CH0032 (SB0221/CH0033) Health Occupations Boards – Reciprocal Licensure and Certification Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0172 /CH0737 (SB0287/CH0738) Department of State Police - Professional Occupations - Application Process Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 737
Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0250 /CH0422 Financial Institutions - Third-Party Service Providers - Examinations Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Economic Matters
1/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0252 /CH0121 Insurance - Holding Companies - Group Capital Calculation and Liquidity Stress Test Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Economic Matters
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0273 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2024 - 1:30 PM
HB0383 /CH0328 (SB0027/CH0329) Cosmetology Licensure Compact Delegate Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328
Economic Matters
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0425 (SB0359) Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0454 /CH0728 (SB0679) Disclosure of Tax Information - Tax Compliance Activity and Binding Data Use Agreements Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 728
Ways and Means
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0628 /CH0045 (SB0409/CH0046) Health Occupations - Clinical Marriage and Family Therapists - Reciprocal Licensure Requirements Delegate Johnson, S. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1007 (SB0766) Fair Share for Maryland Act of 2024 Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1319 Internet Gaming - Authorization and Implementation Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2024 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HJ0009 United States of America - District of Columbia - Statehood Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0027 /CH0329 (HB0383/CH0328) Cosmetology Licensure Compact Senator Gile 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/25/2024 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0204 (HB0034) Interstate Social Work Licensure Compact Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0221 /CH0033 (HB0146/CH0032) Health Occupations Boards – Reciprocal Licensure and Certification Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Finance
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0287 /CH0738 (HB0172/CH0737) Department of State Police - Professional Occupations - Application Process Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 738
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0359 (HB0425) Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0409 /CH0046 (HB0628/CH0045) Health Occupations - Clinical Marriage and Family Therapists - Reciprocal Licensure Requirements Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Finance
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0603 Internet Gaming - Authorization and Implementation Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0627 Horse Racing - Satellite Simulcast Betting - Alterations Senator McKay 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0679 (HB0454/CH0728) Disclosure of Tax Information - Tax Compliance Activity and Binding Data Use Agreements President 6 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0766 (HB1007) Fair Share for Maryland Act of 2024 Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1070 Financial Institutions - Heritage Areas - Canal Place Senator McKay 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:37 PM
Click to return on the top page