Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Internet Access

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0685 /CH0496 (SB0448/CH0497)
Title
Education – Regional Resource Centers and Libraries – Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Branch, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0448 /CH0497 (HB0685/CH0496)
Title
Education - Regional Resource Centers and Libraries - Funding
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0685 /CH0496 (SB0448/CH0497) Education – Regional Resource Centers and Libraries – Funding Delegate Branch, C. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 496
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1163 Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements Delegate Washington 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
3/09/2022 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0448 /CH0497 (HB0685/CH0496) Education - Regional Resource Centers and Libraries - Funding Senator King 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 497
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2022 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/23/2022 4:37 PM
Click to return on the top page