Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Internet Access

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0043
Title
Department of Information Technology - Office of Broadband and Joint Committee on Broadband
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0097 (SB0066/CH0074)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Statewide Broadband - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0156 (SB0283)
Title
Student and Military Voter Empowerment Act
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0587 (SB0917)
Title
Department of Information Technology - Status of Information Technology and Cybersecurity in State Agencies - Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1064
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Net Neutrality Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1263
Title
Maryland Department of Health – COVID–19 Vaccination Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1306
Title
Maryland Cybersecurity Council - Election Security and High-Speed Internet Access
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0066 /CH0074 (HB0097)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Statewide Broadband - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0283 (HB0156)
Title
Student and Military Voter Empowerment Act
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0917 (HB0587)
Title
Department of Information Technology - Status of Information Technology and Cybersecurity in State and Local Agencies
Sponsor
Senator Hester
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0043 Department of Information Technology - Office of Broadband and Joint Committee on Broadband Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0097 (SB0066/CH0074) Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Statewide Broadband - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021) Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB0156 (SB0283) Student and Military Voter Empowerment Act Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0587 (SB0917) Department of Information Technology - Status of Information Technology and Cybersecurity in State Agencies - Reports Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1064 Commercial Law - Maryland Net Neutrality Act of 2021 Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1263 Maryland Department of Health – COVID–19 Vaccination Plan Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1306 Maryland Cybersecurity Council - Election Security and High-Speed Internet Access Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0066 /CH0074 (HB0097) Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Statewide Broadband - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
SB0283 (HB0156) Student and Military Voter Empowerment Act Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0917 (HB0587) Department of Information Technology - Status of Information Technology and Cybersecurity in State and Local Agencies Senator Hester 4 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:14 PM
Click to return on the top page