Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

International Affairs -see also- Foreign Trade

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0484 (SB0470)
Title
General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Dashain Day
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1482 (SB1005/CH0343)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Divestment From Russia
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0008 /JR0006 (SJ0011/JR0007)
Title
Solidarity With the Government and People of Ukraine
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0207 /CH0231
Title
Insurance Carriers and Managed Care Organizations - Cybersecurity Standards
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0218 /CH0119
Title
Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses and Identification Cards – Temporary Renewal
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0364
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Parent's Right to Challenge Curriculum Act
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0470 (HB0484)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Dashain Day
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005 /CH0343 (HB1482)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Divestment From Russia
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0011 /JR0007 (HJ0008/JR0006)
Title
Solidarity With the Government and People of Ukraine
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SS0002
Title
Suspension of Sister State Status for St. Petersburg, Russia
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0484 (SB0470) General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Dashain Day Delegate Bhandari 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2022 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1482 (SB1005/CH0343) State Retirement and Pension System - Divestment From Russia Delegate Lierman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HJ0008 /JR0006 (SJ0011/JR0007) Solidarity With the Government and People of Ukraine Delegate Reznik 2 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 6
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2022 - 8:30 AM
Rules
SB0207 /CH0231 Insurance Carriers and Managed Care Organizations - Cybersecurity Standards Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0218 /CH0119 Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses and Identification Cards – Temporary Renewal Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0364 Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Parent's Right to Challenge Curriculum Act Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0470 (HB0484) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Dashain Day Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB1005 /CH0343 (HB1482) State Retirement and Pension System - Divestment From Russia Senator Elfreth 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2022 - 12:45 PM
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SJ0011 /JR0007 (HJ0008/JR0006) Solidarity With the Government and People of Ukraine Senator Hough 2 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 7
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
SS0002 Suspension of Sister State Status for St. Petersburg, Russia President 6 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/27/2022 8:04 AM
Click to return on the top page