Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Insects -see also- Bees; Pest Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0022 /CH0553 (SB0178/CH0552)
Title
Agriculture - Pollinator Habitat Plan - Requirements for State Highway Administration
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0610
Title
Food Service Facilities - Food Containing Insect Flour - Labeling
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929 /CH0680 (SB0854/CH0681)
Title
Agriculture – Nuisance Insects
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0178 /CH0552 (HB0022/CH0553)
Title
Agriculture – Pollinator Habitat Plan – Requirements for State Highway Administration
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0854 /CH0681 (HB0929/CH0680)
Title
Agriculture – Nuisance Insects
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0022 /CH0553 (SB0178/CH0552) Agriculture - Pollinator Habitat Plan - Requirements for State Highway Administration Delegate Ruth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Finance
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0610 Food Service Facilities - Food Containing Insect Flour - Labeling Delegate Morgan, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0929 /CH0680 (SB0854/CH0681) Agriculture – Nuisance Insects Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 680
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0178 /CH0552 (HB0022/CH0553) Agriculture – Pollinator Habitat Plan – Requirements for State Highway Administration Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Finance
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0854 /CH0681 (HB0929/CH0680) Agriculture – Nuisance Insects Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 681
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/08/2024 - 9:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/15/2024 2:44 PM
Click to return on the top page