Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Indigent Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045
Title
Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Religious Beliefs, Disability, or Homelessness
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1041 /CH0506 (SB0829/CH0507)
Title
Department of Human Services - Family Investment Program - Contract and Program Review
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1102 (SB0799)
Title
Community College Tuition and Residency Waivers - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1226
Title
Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattress Stewardship Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257 (SB0155)
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0155 (HB1257)
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0799 (HB1102)
Title
Community College Tuition and Residency Waivers - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0829 /CH0507 (HB1041/CH0506)
Title
Department of Human Services - Family Investment Program - Contract and Program Review
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0045 Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Religious Beliefs, Disability, or Homelessness Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1041 /CH0506 (SB0829/CH0507) Department of Human Services - Family Investment Program - Contract and Program Review Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 506
Appropriations
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1102 (SB0799) Community College Tuition and Residency Waivers - Funding Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1163 Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements Delegate Washington 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
3/09/2022 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1226 Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattress Stewardship Program - Establishment Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
Economic Matters
HB1257 (SB0155) State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0155 (HB1257) State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0799 (HB1102) Community College Tuition and Residency Waivers - Funding Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0829 /CH0507 (HB1041/CH0506) Department of Human Services - Family Investment Program - Contract and Program Review Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 507
Finance
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/08/2022 - 1:45 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 10:20 AM
Click to return on the top page