Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Indigent Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0197 (SB0448/CH0198)
Title
County Boards of Education – Student Transportation – Vehicles and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0189 /CH0255
Title
Mobile Laundry for the Homeless Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0216 /CH0256 (SB0155/CH0257)
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Exemption for Foster Care Recipients and Homeless Youth - Alterations and Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0316 /CH0597 (SB0023)
Title
Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0998
Title
County Boards of Education - In-Person Instruction and Related Services - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1146
Title
Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattresses and Box Springs
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1331 (SB0898)
Title
Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1369
Title
Housing and Community Development - Shelter and Transitional Housing Facilities Grant Program - Mandated Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023 (HB0316/CH0597)
Title
Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0155 /CH0257 (HB0216/CH0256)
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Exemption for Foster Care Recipients and Homeless Youth - Alterations and Reports
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0448 /CH0198 (HB0072/CH0197)
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Transportation - Vehicles and Report
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0898 (HB1331)
Title
Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0197 (SB0448/CH0198) County Boards of Education – Student Transportation – Vehicles and Report Delegate Anderton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Ways and Means
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0189 /CH0255 Mobile Laundry for the Homeless Pilot Program Delegate Qi 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Appropriations
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0216 /CH0256 (SB0155/CH0257) Higher Education - Tuition Exemption for Foster Care Recipients and Homeless Youth - Alterations and Reports Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Appropriations
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0316 /CH0597 (SB0023) Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring Delegate Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 597
Judiciary
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0998 County Boards of Education - In-Person Instruction and Related Services - Requirement Delegate Griffith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1146 Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattresses and Box Springs Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1331 (SB0898) Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021 Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1369 Housing and Community Development - Shelter and Transitional Housing Facilities Grant Program - Mandated Funding Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0023 (HB0316/CH0597) Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0155 /CH0257 (HB0216/CH0256) Higher Education - Tuition Exemption for Foster Care Recipients and Homeless Youth - Alterations and Reports Senator Washington 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0448 /CH0198 (HB0072/CH0197) County Boards of Education - Student Transportation - Vehicles and Report Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0898 (HB1331) Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021 Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page