Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Immunization

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0076 /CH0231 (SB0018/CH0232)
Title
Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccines
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0085 (SB0641)
Title
Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0184
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0676 /CH0960
Title
Right to Try Act - Individualized Investigational Treatments
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097 /CH0487
Title
State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Veterinary Technicians and Veterinary Assistants
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1430
Title
Education - Public Schools - Parents' Rights (Education Bill of Rights for Families Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0018 /CH0232 (HB0076/CH0231)
Title
Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccines
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0210 /CH0075
Title
Emergency Medical Services - Paramedics - Immunization Administration - Effective Date
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0641 (HB0085)
Title
Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0076 /CH0231 (SB0018/CH0232) Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccines Delegate Lopez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0085 (SB0641) Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
HB0184 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0676 /CH0960 Right to Try Act - Individualized Investigational Treatments Delegate Morgan, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 960
Health and Government Operations
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1097 /CH0487 State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Veterinary Technicians and Veterinary Assistants Delegate Guyton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
4/02/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1430 Education - Public Schools - Parents' Rights (Education Bill of Rights for Families Act) Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0018 /CH0232 (HB0076/CH0231) Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccines Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Finance
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0210 /CH0075 Emergency Medical Services - Paramedics - Immunization Administration - Effective Date Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Finance
1/24/2024 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0641 (HB0085) Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/16/2024 - 9:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:47 PM
Click to return on the top page