Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Immunization

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0017
Title
Public Safety - Emergency Powers Limitations (Consent of the Governed Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540 /CH0093 (SB0139/CH0094)
Title
Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0836 (SB0741)
Title
COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0898
Title
Operating Budget – Unanticipated Federal Funds – Authorized Uses
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0976
Title
Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor – Administration of Vaccinations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1033 (SB0707)
Title
Office of Health Care Quality – Influenza Virus Immunization Education and Information – Assisted Living Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1040 /CH0792 (SB0736/CH0793)
Title
Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Children's Vaccines - Study and Temporary Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1150
Title
Health - Authority of the Secretary of Health and Medical Information
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1171
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Employee Protection Plan for Vaccine Refusal
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1263
Title
Maryland Department of Health – COVID–19 Vaccination Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1313 (SB0067/CH0799)
Title
Emergency Medical Services - Paramedics - Vaccination Administration
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - School Personnel Not Returning to In-Person Instruction and Work - Accommodations and Discipline
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0067 /CH0799 (HB1313)
Title
Emergency Medical Services – Paramedics – Vaccination Administration
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0139 /CH0094 (HB0540/CH0093)
Title
Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0707 (HB1033)
Title
Office of Health Care Quality – Influenza Virus Immunization Education and Information – Assisted Living Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0736 /CH0793 (HB1040/CH0792)
Title
Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Children's Vaccines - Study and Temporary Authority
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0741 (HB0836)
Title
COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0808
Title
Health Occupations – Licensed Dentists – Administration of Vaccines
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0828
Title
HIV Prevention Drugs – Dispensing by Pharmacists and Insurance Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0017 Public Safety - Emergency Powers Limitations (Consent of the Governed Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0540 /CH0093 (SB0139/CH0094) Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact Delegate Morgan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0836 (SB0741) COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021 Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Finance
HB0898 Operating Budget – Unanticipated Federal Funds – Authorized Uses Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0976 Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor – Administration of Vaccinations Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB1033 (SB0707) Office of Health Care Quality – Influenza Virus Immunization Education and Information – Assisted Living Facilities Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1040 /CH0792 (SB0736/CH0793) Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Children's Vaccines - Study and Temporary Authority Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 792
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1150 Health - Authority of the Secretary of Health and Medical Information Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1171 Labor and Employment - Maryland Employee Protection Plan for Vaccine Refusal Delegate Charles 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1263 Maryland Department of Health – COVID–19 Vaccination Plan Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1313 (SB0067/CH0799) Emergency Medical Services - Paramedics - Vaccination Administration Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1322 Primary and Secondary Education - School Personnel Not Returning to In-Person Instruction and Work - Accommodations and Discipline Delegate Washington 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0067 /CH0799 (HB1313) Emergency Medical Services – Paramedics – Vaccination Administration Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 799
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2021 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0139 /CH0094 (HB0540/CH0093) Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0707 (HB1033) Office of Health Care Quality – Influenza Virus Immunization Education and Information – Assisted Living Facilities Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0736 /CH0793 (HB1040/CH0792) Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Children's Vaccines - Study and Temporary Authority Senator Augustine 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 793
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0741 (HB0836) COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
SB0808 Health Occupations – Licensed Dentists – Administration of Vaccines Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0828 HIV Prevention Drugs – Dispensing by Pharmacists and Insurance Requirements Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:50 AM
Click to return on the top page