Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Immigrants and Citizenship -see also- Residency

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008 (SB0048)
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0338 /CH0809 (SB0182/CH0808)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Facial Recognition Technology – Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0380 /CH0043 (SB0374/CH0044)
Title
State Emergency Medical Services Board - Licenses and Certificates - Application Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0451 /CH0727 (SB0676)
Title
Tax Assistance for Low-Income Marylanders - Funding
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0473 (SB0637)
Title
Higher Education - Undocumented Students - Out-of-State Tuition Exemption Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Pasteur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0616 (SB0392)
Title
Agricultural Land - Adversarial Foreign Governments - Restrictions on Property Interests
Sponsor
Delegate Munoz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885
Title
Agricultural Land and Programs - People's Republic of China
Sponsor
Delegate Chisholm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0961
Title
State Government - Commission on New Americans - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Taveras
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1088 (SB0605)
Title
Election Law - Automatic Voter Registration - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1130
Title
Criminal Procedure - U Nonimmigrant Status Petition - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Martinez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1505
Title
Correctional Services - Transfers to Federal Authorities - Undocumented Immigrants (Protecting Marylanders From Violent Crime Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0048 (HB0008)
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0182 /CH0808 (HB0338/CH0809)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0374 /CH0044 (HB0380/CH0043)
Title
State Emergency Medical Services Board - Licenses and Certificates - Application Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0392 (HB0616)
Title
Agricultural Land - Adversarial Foreign Governments - Restrictions on Property Interests
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0605 (HB1088)
Title
Election Law - Automatic Voter Registration - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0637 (HB0473)
Title
Higher Education - Undocumented Students - Out-of-State Tuition Exemption Eligibility
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0676 (HB0451/CH0727)
Title
Tax Assistance for Low-Income Marylanders - Funding
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1142 /CH0804 (HB1506)
Title
Tax Assistance for Low-Income Marylanders - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 (SB0048) Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0338 /CH0809 (SB0182/CH0808) Criminal Procedure – Facial Recognition Technology – Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Delegate Moon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 809
Judiciary
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0380 /CH0043 (SB0374/CH0044) State Emergency Medical Services Board - Licenses and Certificates - Application Requirements Delegate Solomon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0451 /CH0727 (SB0676) Tax Assistance for Low-Income Marylanders - Funding Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 727
Ways and Means
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0473 (SB0637) Higher Education - Undocumented Students - Out-of-State Tuition Exemption Eligibility Delegate Pasteur 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Appropriations
2/27/2024 - 12:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0616 (SB0392) Agricultural Land - Adversarial Foreign Governments - Restrictions on Property Interests Delegate Munoz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0885 Agricultural Land and Programs - People's Republic of China Delegate Chisholm 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0961 State Government - Commission on New Americans - Established Delegate Taveras 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2024 - 2:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1088 (SB0605) Election Law - Automatic Voter Registration - Alterations Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1130 Criminal Procedure - U Nonimmigrant Status Petition - Statute of Limitations Delegate Martinez 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB1505 Correctional Services - Transfers to Federal Authorities - Undocumented Immigrants (Protecting Marylanders From Violent Crime Act of 2024) Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0048 (HB0008) Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2024 - 2:30 PM
SB0182 /CH0808 (HB0338/CH0809) Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 808
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0256 Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Revisions Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0374 /CH0044 (HB0380/CH0043) State Emergency Medical Services Board - Licenses and Certificates - Application Requirements Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Finance
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0392 (HB0616) Agricultural Land - Adversarial Foreign Governments - Restrictions on Property Interests Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0605 (HB1088) Election Law - Automatic Voter Registration - Alterations Senator Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0637 (HB0473) Higher Education - Undocumented Students - Out-of-State Tuition Exemption Eligibility Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0676 (HB0451/CH0727) Tax Assistance for Low-Income Marylanders - Funding President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1142 /CH0804 (HB1506) Tax Assistance for Low-Income Marylanders - Funding Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 804
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:40 PM
Click to return on the top page