Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Commercial Law - Generally (I4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0053
Title
Task Force to Study E-Commerce Monopolies in the State (E-Commerce Antimonopoly Study of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Wu
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0468 /CH0950 (SB0532/CH0949)
Title
Commission to Advance Lithium-Ion Battery Safety in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0514 (SB0107)
Title
Commercial Law - Statutory Liens - Motor Vehicles Towed or Removed From Parking Lots
Sponsor
Delegate Allen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0595
Title
Civil Enforcement Actions Brought by the Attorney General - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0661
Title
Consumer Protection and Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Requirements on Judgment Creditors
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0824
Title
Maryland Self-Service Storage Act - Sale of Personal Property in Satisfaction of Liens - Means of Advertising
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0851
Title
State Government – Maryland Reparations Commission – Establishment (Maryland Repair Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1150 /CH0145 (SB0800/CH0146)
Title
Maryland Uniform Disposition of Abandoned Property Act – Maryland 529 Program – Exemption
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1156 (SB0930)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Wire Transfers - Liability (Elder Fraud Prevention Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1182
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Enforcement Remedies
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1425 (SB0998)
Title
Commercial Law - Earned Wage Access Services
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107 (HB0514)
Title
Commercial Law - Statutory Liens - Motor Vehicles Towed or Removed From Parking Lots
Sponsor
Senator James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532 /CH0949 (HB0468/CH0950)
Title
Commission to Advance Lithium–Ion Battery Safety in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0633 /CH0629
Title
Maryland Self-Service Storage Act - Sale of Personal Property in Satisfaction of Liens - Means of Advertising
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0800 /CH0146 (HB1150/CH0145)
Title
Maryland Uniform Disposition of Abandoned Property Act – Maryland 529 Program – Exemption
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0930 (HB1156)
Title
Commercial Law – Consumer Wire Transfers – Liability (Elder Fraud Prevention Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0998 (HB1425)
Title
Commercial Law - Earned Wage Access Services
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0053 Task Force to Study E-Commerce Monopolies in the State (E-Commerce Antimonopoly Study of 2024) Delegate Wu 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0468 /CH0950 (SB0532/CH0949) Commission to Advance Lithium-Ion Battery Safety in Maryland Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 950
Economic Matters
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0514 (SB0107) Commercial Law - Statutory Liens - Motor Vehicles Towed or Removed From Parking Lots Delegate Allen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0595 Civil Enforcement Actions Brought by the Attorney General - Statute of Limitations Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0661 Consumer Protection and Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Requirements on Judgment Creditors Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0824 Maryland Self-Service Storage Act - Sale of Personal Property in Satisfaction of Liens - Means of Advertising Delegate Johnson, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Economic Matters
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0851 State Government – Maryland Reparations Commission – Establishment (Maryland Repair Act) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1150 /CH0145 (SB0800/CH0146) Maryland Uniform Disposition of Abandoned Property Act – Maryland 529 Program – Exemption Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Appropriations
2/28/2024 - 12:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1156 (SB0930) Commercial Law - Consumer Wire Transfers - Liability (Elder Fraud Prevention Act of 2024) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1182 Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Enforcement Remedies Chair, Economic Matters Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1425 (SB0998) Commercial Law - Earned Wage Access Services Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0107 (HB0514) Commercial Law - Statutory Liens - Motor Vehicles Towed or Removed From Parking Lots Senator James 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0532 /CH0949 (HB0468/CH0950) Commission to Advance Lithium–Ion Battery Safety in Maryland Senator Gallion 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 949
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Environment and Transportation
SB0633 /CH0629 Maryland Self-Service Storage Act - Sale of Personal Property in Satisfaction of Liens - Means of Advertising Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629
Finance
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0800 /CH0146 (HB1150/CH0145) Maryland Uniform Disposition of Abandoned Property Act – Maryland 529 Program – Exemption President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0930 (HB1156) Commercial Law – Consumer Wire Transfers – Liability (Elder Fraud Prevention Act of 2024) Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0998 (HB1425) Commercial Law - Earned Wage Access Services Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:46 PM
Click to return on the top page