Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Commercial Law - Generally (I4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0487 /CH0575 (SB0613)
Title
Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Foley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0594
Title
State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0271 /CH0361
Title
Commercial Law - Disposition of Abandoned Property - Waiver of Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0613 (HB0487/CH0575)
Title
Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0487 /CH0575 (SB0613) Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements Delegate Foley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 575
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0594 State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act) Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0271 /CH0361 Commercial Law - Disposition of Abandoned Property - Waiver of Penalties Senator Guzzone 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0613 (HB0487/CH0575) Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:06 PM
Click to return on the top page