Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Financial Institutions (I1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0128 /CH0618
Title
Debt Settlement Services – Student Education Loan Debt Relief – Disclosures and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0305 /CH0648
Title
Financial Institutions - Presumption of Property Abandonment - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0804 /CH0106 (SB0252/CH0107)
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Enhanced Consumer Protections and Enforcement Tools
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0984
Title
Maryland State Bank Task Force - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1135 (SB0855)
Title
Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts - Deposits by Financial Institutions
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1204
Title
Financial Institutions - Decentralized Financial Regulatory Sandbox Program
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1211 (SB0825)
Title
Consumer Credit - Commercial Financing Transactions
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0060
Title
Financial Institutions – Abandoned Property – Notice and Records
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0217
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Loans - Payments and Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0252 /CH0107 (HB0804/CH0106)
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Enhanced Consumer Protections and Enforcement Tools
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0271 /CH0361
Title
Commercial Law - Disposition of Abandoned Property - Waiver of Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0825 (HB1211)
Title
Commercial Financing Transactions - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0855 (HB1135)
Title
Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts - Deposits by Financial Institutions
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0898
Title
Domestic Violence Survivor Resilience Loan Program and Guarantee Fund
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0128 /CH0618 Debt Settlement Services – Student Education Loan Debt Relief – Disclosures and Prohibitions Delegate Lopez 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 618
Economic Matters
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0305 /CH0648 Financial Institutions - Presumption of Property Abandonment - Revisions Delegate Kerr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 648
Economic Matters
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0804 /CH0106 (SB0252/CH0107) Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Enhanced Consumer Protections and Enforcement Tools Delegate Queen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Economic Matters
Finance
HB0984 Maryland State Bank Task Force - Establishment Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1135 (SB0855) Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts - Deposits by Financial Institutions Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1204 Financial Institutions - Decentralized Financial Regulatory Sandbox Program Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1211 (SB0825) Consumer Credit - Commercial Financing Transactions Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
SB0060 Financial Institutions – Abandoned Property – Notice and Records Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Finance
SB0217 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Loans - Payments and Fees Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - House Refuses to Recede
Finance
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0252 /CH0107 (HB0804/CH0106) Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Enhanced Consumer Protections and Enforcement Tools Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Finance
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0271 /CH0361 Commercial Law - Disposition of Abandoned Property - Waiver of Penalties Senator Guzzone 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0825 (HB1211) Commercial Financing Transactions - Requirements Senator Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0855 (HB1135) Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts - Deposits by Financial Institutions Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0898 Domestic Violence Survivor Resilience Loan Program and Guarantee Fund Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:16 PM
Click to return on the top page