Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Human Trafficking -see also- Prostitution; Crimes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0165
Title
Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Human and Sex Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0270 /CH0487 (SB0091/CH0488)
Title
Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Maintenance of Guest Records and Employee Human Trafficking Awareness Training and Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0754 (SB0769)
Title
Minors Convicted as Adults – Sentencing – Transfer to Juvenile Court
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0833 (SB0768)
Title
Criminal Law - Victims of Child Sex Trafficking and Human Trafficking - Safe Harbor and Service Response
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046 (SB0762)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091 /CH0488 (HB0270/CH0487)
Title
Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Maintenance of Guest Records and Employee Human Trafficking Awareness Training and Policy
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0389
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Accountability Act Revisions and Clarifications
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0762 (HB1046)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0767
Title
Criminal Procedure - Human Trafficking - Vacatur and Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0768 (HB0833)
Title
Criminal Law - Victims of Child Sex Trafficking and Human Trafficking - Safe Harbor and Service Response
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0769 (HB0754)
Title
Minors Convicted as Adults - Sentencing - Transfer to Juvenile Court
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0910
Title
Nondiscrimination – Courts and Other Governmental Entities – Prohibitions, Policy, and Training (Access to Justice for All Youth)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0165 Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Human and Sex Trafficking Delegate Johnson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/18/2022 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0270 /CH0487 (SB0091/CH0488) Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Maintenance of Guest Records and Employee Human Trafficking Awareness Training and Policy Delegate Ebersole 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487
Economic Matters
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0754 (SB0769) Minors Convicted as Adults – Sentencing – Transfer to Juvenile Court Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0833 (SB0768) Criminal Law - Victims of Child Sex Trafficking and Human Trafficking - Safe Harbor and Service Response Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Judiciary
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1046 (SB0762) Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0091 /CH0488 (HB0270/CH0487) Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Maintenance of Guest Records and Employee Human Trafficking Awareness Training and Policy Senator Jackson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 488
Finance
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0389 Public Safety - Maryland Police Accountability Act Revisions and Clarifications Senator Jackson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/08/2022 - 9:00 AM
SB0762 (HB1046) Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0767 Criminal Procedure - Human Trafficking - Vacatur and Expungement Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0768 (HB0833) Criminal Law - Victims of Child Sex Trafficking and Human Trafficking - Safe Harbor and Service Response Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0769 (HB0754) Minors Convicted as Adults - Sentencing - Transfer to Juvenile Court Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0910 Nondiscrimination – Courts and Other Governmental Entities – Prohibitions, Policy, and Training (Access to Justice for All Youth) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:11 PM
Click to return on the top page