Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Human Trafficking

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0001 (SB0007)
Title
Department of Transportation - Human Trafficking Awareness, Training, and Response (See Someone, Save Someone Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0441 (SB0389)
Title
Minors Convicted as Adults - Sentencing - Transfer to Juvenile Court
Sponsor
Delegate Simpson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0652 (SB0454)
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Employees - Prohibited Convictions
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1077
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Prospective Tenant Criminal History Records Check (Maryland Fair Chance Housing Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Boafo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0007 (HB0001)
Title
Department of Transportation – Human Trafficking Awareness, Training, and Response (See Someone, Save Someone Act)
Sponsor
Senator Jackson, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0389 (HB0441)
Title
Minors Convicted as Adults - Sentencing - Transfer to Juvenile Court
Sponsor
Senator Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0454 (HB0652)
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Employees - Prohibited Convictions
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0514
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Prospective Tenant Criminal History Records Check (Maryland Fair Chance Housing Act)
Sponsor
Senator Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0001 (SB0007) Department of Transportation - Human Trafficking Awareness, Training, and Response (See Someone, Save Someone Act) Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
1/24/2025 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0441 (SB0389) Minors Convicted as Adults - Sentencing - Transfer to Juvenile Court Delegate Simpson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0652 (SB0454) Department of Juvenile Services - Employees - Prohibited Convictions Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1077 Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Prospective Tenant Criminal History Records Check (Maryland Fair Chance Housing Act) Delegate Boafo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0007 (HB0001) Department of Transportation – Human Trafficking Awareness, Training, and Response (See Someone, Save Someone Act) Senator Jackson, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2025 - 10:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0389 (HB0441) Minors Convicted as Adults - Sentencing - Transfer to Juvenile Court Senator Folden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0454 (HB0652) Department of Juvenile Services - Employees - Prohibited Convictions Senator McKay 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 10:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2025 - 10:00 AM
SB0514 Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Prospective Tenant Criminal History Records Check (Maryland Fair Chance Housing Act) Senator Henson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/7/2025 11:59 PM
Click to return on the top page