Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Human Rights -see also- Human Trafficking

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0070 (SB0315)
Title
Courts – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0159
Title
Economic Justice and Racial Reconciliation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0181
Title
Declaration of Rights - Religious Freedom, Religious Tests, and Oaths and Affirmations
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0463
Title
Civil Rights - Violation of Rights - Governmental Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0495 (SB0519)
Title
Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1171
Title
Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Liberty
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1190
Title
Calvert County - Civic Education - Standards and Curriculum (Social Studies Literacy Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1232
Title
State House Trust - Lawyer's Mall - Commemoration of Landmark Civil Rights Case Brown v. Calvert County Board of Education
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1255 /CH0031 (SB0705/CH0562)
Title
Education - Physical Restraint and Seclusion - Limitations, Reporting, and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1256
Title
Education - Discriminatory Concepts in Instruction - Prohibition (Ending Discrimination in Public Education Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Chisholm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1364
Title
Health Care Freedom of Conscience Act
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1368
Title
Business Regulation - Social Media Websites - Censored Speech
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0011
Title
Workgroup on Online Consumer Personal Information Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0315 (HB0070)
Title
Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0519 (HB0495)
Title
Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0705 /CH0562 (HB1255/CH0031)
Title
Education – Physical Restraint and Seclusion – Limitations, Reporting, and Training
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941
Title
State Superintendent of Schools - Authority for Investigations - Local School Systems
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SS0002
Title
Suspension of Sister State Status for St. Petersburg, Russia
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0070 (SB0315) Courts – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0159 Economic Justice and Racial Reconciliation Act Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0181 Declaration of Rights - Religious Freedom, Religious Tests, and Oaths and Affirmations Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB0463 Civil Rights - Violation of Rights - Governmental Liability Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0495 (SB0519) Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1171 Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Liberty Delegate Jones, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1190 Calvert County - Civic Education - Standards and Curriculum (Social Studies Literacy Act) Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1232 State House Trust - Lawyer's Mall - Commemoration of Landmark Civil Rights Case Brown v. Calvert County Board of Education Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1255 /CH0031 (SB0705/CH0562) Education - Physical Restraint and Seclusion - Limitations, Reporting, and Training Delegate Ebersole 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 31
Ways and Means
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1256 Education - Discriminatory Concepts in Instruction - Prohibition (Ending Discrimination in Public Education Act of 2022) Delegate Chisholm 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1364 Health Care Freedom of Conscience Act Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1368 Business Regulation - Social Media Websites - Censored Speech Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0011 Workgroup on Online Consumer Personal Information Privacy Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0315 (HB0070) Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0519 (HB0495) Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0705 /CH0562 (HB1255/CH0031) Education – Physical Restraint and Seclusion – Limitations, Reporting, and Training Senator Zucker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 562
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2022 - 1:03 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0941 State Superintendent of Schools - Authority for Investigations - Local School Systems Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SS0002 Suspension of Sister State Status for St. Petersburg, Russia President 6 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:07 PM
Click to return on the top page