Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Howard County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0085 /CH0199 (SB0651/CH0200)
Title
Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0257 /CH0219 (SB0236/CH0220)
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0487
Title
Education – School Construction – Pedestrian Safety Plans (School Pedestrian Safety Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0740 (SB0576)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2021
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1094 (SB0650)
Title
Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1142 /CH0187
Title
Howard County – School Redistricting – Public Testimony Ho. Co. 07-21
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1151 /CH0566
Title
Howard County - Class A Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Quota by Election District Ho. Co. 02-21
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1152 /CH0661
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License - Off-Premises Consumption Ho. Co. 04-21
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1155 /CH0662
Title
Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Delivery Ho. Co. 01–21
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1189
Title
Howard County Board of Education - School Safety Personnel Ho. Co. 10-21
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1190 /CH0396
Title
Howard County – Board of Education – Redetermination of Geographic Attendance Area Ho. Co. 05-21
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1191 /CH0563
Title
Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors Ho. Co. 03-21
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1285
Title
Howard County - Fee for Rental Housing Services - Established Ho. Co. 15-21
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1374 /CH0576
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071 /CH0060
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Body-Worn Cameras, Employee Programs, and Use of Force
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0236 /CH0220 (HB0257/CH0219)
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0576 (HB0740)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2021
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0650 (HB1094)
Title
Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0651 /CH0200 (HB0085/CH0199)
Title
Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0966
Title
Virtual Schools – Statewide Education Platform – Procurement and Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0085 /CH0199 (SB0651/CH0200) Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers Delegate Bhandari 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Economic Matters
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0257 /CH0219 (SB0236/CH0220) Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Reporting Delegate Qi 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2021 - 4:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0487 Education – School Construction – Pedestrian Safety Plans (School Pedestrian Safety Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0740 (SB0576) Building Opportunity Act of 2021 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB1094 (SB0650) Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1142 /CH0187 Howard County – School Redistricting – Public Testimony Ho. Co. 07-21 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1151 /CH0566 Howard County - Class A Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Quota by Election District Ho. Co. 02-21 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 566
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1152 /CH0661 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License - Off-Premises Consumption Ho. Co. 04-21 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1155 /CH0662 Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Delivery Ho. Co. 01–21 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 662
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1189 Howard County Board of Education - School Safety Personnel Ho. Co. 10-21 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1190 /CH0396 Howard County – Board of Education – Redetermination of Geographic Attendance Area Ho. Co. 05-21 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 396
Ways and Means
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1191 /CH0563 Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors Ho. Co. 03-21 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 563
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1285 Howard County - Fee for Rental Housing Services - Established Ho. Co. 15-21 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1374 /CH0576 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576
Appropriations
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0071 /CH0060 Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Body-Worn Cameras, Employee Programs, and Use of Force Senator Sydnor 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 60
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0236 /CH0220 (HB0257/CH0219) Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Reporting Senator Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
SB0576 (HB0740) Building Opportunity Act of 2021 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Budget and Taxation
SB0650 (HB1094) Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility Senator Klausmeier 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0651 /CH0200 (HB0085/CH0199) Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0966 Virtual Schools – Statewide Education Platform – Procurement and Establishment Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:16 AM
Click to return on the top page