Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Hospices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008 (SB0275/CH0048)
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0276 (SB0513)
Title
Health Occupations - Clinical Nurse Specialists - Prescribing Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1327 /CH0211
Title
Education - Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1379
Title
Hospitals, Related Institutions, and Hospice Facilities - COVID-19 and Other Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008)
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0513 (HB0276)
Title
Health Occupations - Clinical Nurse Specialists - Prescribing Authority
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 (SB0275/CH0048) Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0276 (SB0513) Health Occupations - Clinical Nurse Specialists - Prescribing Authority Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1327 /CH0211 Education - Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students - Report Delegate Bhandari 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Ways and Means
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1379 Hospitals, Related Institutions, and Hospice Facilities - COVID-19 and Other Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Visitation Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008) Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022) Senator Hayes 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 48
Finance
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0513 (HB0276) Health Occupations - Clinical Nurse Specialists - Prescribing Authority Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:29 AM
Click to return on the top page