Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Home Schooling -see also- Education

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0618
Title
Maryland Parental Rights Act
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0832
Title
Education - Maryland Homeschool Advisory Council - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0953
Title
Parent and Guardian Rights - Education, Health, and Upbringing of Children
Sponsor
Delegate Novotny
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1122 (SB0987)
Title
Public Schools - Home School Students - Extracurricular Activities (Right to Play Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0987 (HB1122)
Title
Public Schools - Home School Students - Extracurricular Activities (Right to Play Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0618 Maryland Parental Rights Act Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0832 Education - Maryland Homeschool Advisory Council - Establishment Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0953 Parent and Guardian Rights - Education, Health, and Upbringing of Children Delegate Novotny 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2022 - 12:30 PM
HB1122 (SB0987) Public Schools - Home School Students - Extracurricular Activities (Right to Play Act of 2022) Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2022 - 2:30 PM
SB0987 (HB1122) Public Schools - Home School Students - Extracurricular Activities (Right to Play Act of 2022) Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2022 2:53 PM
Click to return on the top page