Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Homeland Security

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0159
Title
Public Safety - Persistent Aerial Surveillance
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1227 (SB0864)
Title
Public Safety - Task Force on Preventing and Countering Domestic Terrorism
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0864 (HB1227)
Title
Public Safety - Task Force on Preventing and Countering Domestic Terrorism
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0953
Title
Domestic Terrorism Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0159 Public Safety - Persistent Aerial Surveillance Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1227 (SB0864) Public Safety - Task Force on Preventing and Countering Domestic Terrorism Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0864 (HB1227) Public Safety - Task Force on Preventing and Countering Domestic Terrorism Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0953 Domestic Terrorism Task Force Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/15/2021 1:27 PM
Click to return on the top page