Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Home Improvement

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0074 (SB0198)
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Energy Efficiency Upgrades - Passive Houses
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0395
Title
Business Regulation – Home Improvement Contracts – Deposits
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0408
Title
Business Regulation – Home Improvement Contracts – Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574
Title
Montgomery County Stable Homes Act MC 8–21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1290 (SB0782)
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Real Property Assessments and Appeals
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0198 (HB0074)
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Energy Efficiency Upgrades - Passive Houses
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0305 (HB0079)
Title
Legal Advertisement or Legal Notice – Publication in Newspaper or Newspaper in General Circulation – Online Newspapers
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0782 (HB1290)
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Real Property Assessments and Appeals
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0074 (SB0198) Income Tax - Credit for Energy Efficiency Upgrades - Passive Houses Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0395 Business Regulation – Home Improvement Contracts – Deposits Delegate Adams 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Economic Matters
1/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0408 Business Regulation – Home Improvement Contracts – Payments Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
1/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0574 Montgomery County Stable Homes Act MC 8–21 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1290 (SB0782) State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Real Property Assessments and Appeals Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0198 (HB0074) Income Tax - Credit for Energy Efficiency Upgrades - Passive Houses Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0305 (HB0079) Legal Advertisement or Legal Notice – Publication in Newspaper or Newspaper in General Circulation – Online Newspapers Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0782 (HB1290) State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Real Property Assessments and Appeals Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 11:49 PM
Click to return on the top page