Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Home Care Services -see also- Respite Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Income Tax - Caregiver Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Harrison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0039 /CH0881 (SB0197/CH0882)
Title
Residential Service Agencies - Reimbursement - Personal Assistance Services (Homecare Worker Rights Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0184
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0189 /CH0865
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Personal Care Aides - Wage Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0215 /CH0034 (SB0226/CH0035)
Title
Human Services - Attendant Care Program - Ongoing Additional Supports
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255 (SB0223)
Title
Interagency Committee on Aging Services – Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1176 (SB1057)
Title
Home- and Community-Based Services Waiver - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1397 /CH0377 (SB0590)
Title
Civil Rights - Discrimination Based on Protected Characteristics and Reproductive Freedom
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0197 /CH0882 (HB0039/CH0881)
Title
Residential Service Agencies - Reimbursement - Personal Assistance Services (Homecare Worker Rights Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0202 /CH0161
Title
Department of Aging - Caregiver Expense Grant Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Provider Agencies and Personal Care Aides - Reimbursement and Wages
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0223 (HB0255)
Title
Interagency Committee on Aging Services – Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0226 /CH0035 (HB0215/CH0034)
Title
Human Services - Attendant Care Program - Ongoing Additional Supports
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0371 /CH0864
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Personal Care Aides - Wage Reports
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0590 (HB1397/CH0377)
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination - Protected Characteristics
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0988
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Self-Directed Mental Health Services - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1057 (HB1176)
Title
Home– and Community–Based Services Waiver – Eligibility
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 Income Tax - Caregiver Tax Credit Delegate Harrison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0039 /CH0881 (SB0197/CH0882) Residential Service Agencies - Reimbursement - Personal Assistance Services (Homecare Worker Rights Act of 2024) Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 881
Health and Government Operations
1/24/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0184 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0189 /CH0865 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Personal Care Aides - Wage Reports Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 865
Health and Government Operations
1/24/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0215 /CH0034 (SB0226/CH0035) Human Services - Attendant Care Program - Ongoing Additional Supports Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0255 (SB0223) Interagency Committee on Aging Services – Repeal Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB1176 (SB1057) Home- and Community-Based Services Waiver - Eligibility Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2024 - 2:00 PM
HB1397 /CH0377 (SB0590) Civil Rights - Discrimination Based on Protected Characteristics and Reproductive Freedom Delegate Simmons 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 377
Economic Matters
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
SB0197 /CH0882 (HB0039/CH0881) Residential Service Agencies - Reimbursement - Personal Assistance Services (Homecare Worker Rights Act of 2024) Senator Ellis 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 882
Finance
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0202 /CH0161 Department of Aging - Caregiver Expense Grant Program - Established Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Budget and Taxation
1/17/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0208 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Provider Agencies and Personal Care Aides - Reimbursement and Wages Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
Budget and Taxation
SB0223 (HB0255) Interagency Committee on Aging Services – Repeal Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0226 /CH0035 (HB0215/CH0034) Human Services - Attendant Care Program - Ongoing Additional Supports Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Finance
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0371 /CH0864 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Personal Care Aides - Wage Reports Senator Lam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 864
Finance
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0590 (HB1397/CH0377) Human Relations - Discrimination - Protected Characteristics Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2024 - 10:00 AM
Finance
SB0988 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Self-Directed Mental Health Services - Pilot Program Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1057 (HB1176) Home– and Community–Based Services Waiver – Eligibility Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:42 PM
Click to return on the top page