Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Holidays and Special Dates

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0122
Title
General Provisions – Commemorative Month – Small Business Month
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0160
Title
Elementary and Secondary Schools - Workplace Readiness Week - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0179
Title
Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0295 (SB0103)
Title
Overdose Awareness Day
Sponsor
Delegate Long, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0448 (SB0387)
Title
Korean American Day
Sponsor
Delegate Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0568
Title
Community Health Worker Appreciation Day
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993
Title
Commemorative Weeks - Maryland Climate Education Week
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1354
Title
Public Schools - Veterans' Day - Authorized Public School Holiday
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1491 (SB0467)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Prince Hall Day
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0103 (HB0295)
Title
Overdose Awareness Day
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0105
Title
Burial Sites of Enslaved Persons - Protection and Access (Emancipation for the Maryland Deceased Enslaved Act)
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0176
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Day - Veterans' Day
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0387 (HB0448)
Title
Korean American Day
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0467 (HB1491)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Prince Hall Day
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0615 /CH0805
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Maryland Veterans Suicide Prevention Day
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0646
Title
General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Hip Hop Day of Service
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0122 General Provisions – Commemorative Month – Small Business Month Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0160 Elementary and Secondary Schools - Workplace Readiness Week - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0179 Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0295 (SB0103) Overdose Awareness Day Delegate Long, J. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB0448 (SB0387) Korean American Day Delegate Watson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0568 Community Health Worker Appreciation Day Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0993 Commemorative Weeks - Maryland Climate Education Week Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1354 Public Schools - Veterans' Day - Authorized Public School Holiday Delegate Howard 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment
Ways and Means
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1491 (SB0467) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Prince Hall Day Delegate Rogers 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0103 (HB0295) Overdose Awareness Day Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/08/2024 - 9:00 AM
SB0105 Burial Sites of Enslaved Persons - Protection and Access (Emancipation for the Maryland Deceased Enslaved Act) Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0176 Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Day - Veterans' Day Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/24/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0387 (HB0448) Korean American Day Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/08/2024 - 9:00 AM
SB0467 (HB1491) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Prince Hall Day Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/08/2024 - 9:00 AM
SB0615 /CH0805 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Maryland Veterans Suicide Prevention Day Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 805
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/08/2024 - 9:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0646 General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Hip Hop Day of Service Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/08/2024 - 9:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/23/2024 4:42 PM
Click to return on the top page