Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Holidays and Special Dates

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0024
Title
State Holidays - Primary Election Day
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0157 (SB0421)
Title
Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0300 (SB0025)
Title
Commemorative Days - Maryland Voting Equity Reform Day
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0448
Title
State Government - Legal and Employee Holiday - Juneteenth National Freedom Day
Sponsor
Delegate Harrison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0586 (SB0303)
Title
General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0676 (SB0667)
Title
General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Dashain Day
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1364 /CH0687 (SB0946/CH0688)
Title
Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0025 (HB0300)
Title
Commemorative Days - Maryland Voting Equity Reform Day
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0142
Title
Legal Holiday - Maryland Emancipation Day - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0303 (HB0586)
Title
General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0358
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Pongal Day
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0421 (HB0157)
Title
Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0667 (HB0676)
Title
General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Dashain Day
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0936
Title
General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Overdose Awareness Day
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0946 /CH0688 (HB1364/CH0687)
Title
Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0024 State Holidays - Primary Election Day Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0157 (SB0421) Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0300 (SB0025) Commemorative Days - Maryland Voting Equity Reform Day Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0448 State Government - Legal and Employee Holiday - Juneteenth National Freedom Day Delegate Harrison 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0586 (SB0303) General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0676 (SB0667) General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Dashain Day Delegate Bhandari 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1364 /CH0687 (SB0946/CH0688) Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission Delegate Crosby 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 687
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/29/2021 - 9:30 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0025 (HB0300) Commemorative Days - Maryland Voting Equity Reform Day Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0142 Legal Holiday - Maryland Emancipation Day - Establishment Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0303 (HB0586) General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day Senator Patterson 2 2 In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0358 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Pongal Day Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0421 (HB0157) Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0667 (HB0676) General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Dashain Day Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0936 General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Overdose Awareness Day Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0946 /CH0688 (HB1364/CH0687) Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission Senator Bailey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 688
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:17 AM
Click to return on the top page