Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

State Highway Administration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0019 /CH0553
Title
Education - School Construction - Pedestrian Safety Plans (Safe Walk to School Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0064
Title
State Highways – Designated Shoulder Areas – Establishment and Use by Transit Buses
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0073 /CH0171
Title
Baltimore City – Complete Streets and Safe Routes to School Programs – Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0151
Title
Traffic Control Device Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0222 /CH0565 (SB0416)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving in Right-Hand Lanes - Interstate Highways in Rural Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254 /CH0153 (SB0874/CH0154)
Title
State Highway Administration - Pedestrian and Bicyclist Fatalities - Infrastructure Review (Vision Zero Implementation Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656 (SB0880)
Title
Safe Access for All (SAFE) Roads Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0813 /CH0216
Title
Montgomery County – Speed and School Bus Monitoring Systems MC 03–22
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1022
Title
State Highway Administration - Route 5 Reconstruction Project at Great Mills
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1024 (SB0584)
Title
Task Force on Traffic Patterns and Infrastructure on MD Route 45 (York Road)
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1032
Title
State Highway Administration - Highway Cleanup - Records and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1433 /CH0160
Title
State Highways – Designations – Piscataway Highway
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0416 (HB0222/CH0565)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving in Right-Hand Lanes - Interstate Highways in Rural Areas
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0584 (HB1024)
Title
Task Force on Traffic Patterns and Infrastructure on MD Route 45 (York Road)
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0874 /CH0154 (HB0254/CH0153)
Title
State Highway Administration - Pedestrian and Bicyclist Fatalities - Infrastructure Review (Vision Zero Implementation Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0880 (HB0656)
Title
Safe Access for All (SAFE) Roads Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0019 /CH0553 Education - School Construction - Pedestrian Safety Plans (Safe Walk to School Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 553
Appropriations
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0064 State Highways – Designated Shoulder Areas – Establishment and Use by Transit Buses Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0073 /CH0171 Baltimore City – Complete Streets and Safe Routes to School Programs – Funding Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0151 Traffic Control Device Monitoring Systems - Authorization Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0222 /CH0565 (SB0416) Vehicle Laws - Driving in Right-Hand Lanes - Interstate Highways in Rural Areas Delegate Parrott 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 565
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0254 /CH0153 (SB0874/CH0154) State Highway Administration - Pedestrian and Bicyclist Fatalities - Infrastructure Review (Vision Zero Implementation Act of 2022) Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0656 (SB0880) Safe Access for All (SAFE) Roads Act of 2022 Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
HB0813 /CH0216 Montgomery County – Speed and School Bus Monitoring Systems MC 03–22 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1022 State Highway Administration - Route 5 Reconstruction Project at Great Mills Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1024 (SB0584) Task Force on Traffic Patterns and Infrastructure on MD Route 45 (York Road) Delegate Forbes 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB1032 State Highway Administration - Highway Cleanup - Records and Reporting Delegate Charles 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1433 /CH0160 State Highways – Designations – Piscataway Highway Delegate Walker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0416 (HB0222/CH0565) Vehicle Laws - Driving in Right-Hand Lanes - Interstate Highways in Rural Areas Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0584 (HB1024) Task Force on Traffic Patterns and Infrastructure on MD Route 45 (York Road) Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0874 /CH0154 (HB0254/CH0153) State Highway Administration - Pedestrian and Bicyclist Fatalities - Infrastructure Review (Vision Zero Implementation Act of 2022) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Finance
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0880 (HB0656) Safe Access for All (SAFE) Roads Act of 2022 Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:14 PM
Click to return on the top page