Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Heating and Cooling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0502
Title
Public Safety - Fire Dampers, Smoke Dampers, Combination Fire Smoke Dampers, and Smoke Control Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Long, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0864 /CH0539
Title
Energy Efficiency and Conservation Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1077
Title
Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Climate Change Coordinator – Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1279 (SB1023)
Title
Maryland Building Performance Standards - Fossil Fuel Use, Energy Conservation, and Electric- and Solar-Ready Standards (Better Buildings Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Boafo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1295
Title
Real Property - Residential Rental Apartments - Air-Conditioning Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1463 (SB0848)
Title
Enoch Pratt Free Library - Capital Project Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Edelson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0848 (HB1463)
Title
Enoch Pratt Free Library - Capital Project Funding
Sponsor
Senator Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0966 /CH0722
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1023 (HB1279)
Title
Maryland Building Performance Standards – Fossil Fuel Use, Energy Conservation, and Electric– and Solar–Ready Standards (Better Buildings Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0502 Public Safety - Fire Dampers, Smoke Dampers, Combination Fire Smoke Dampers, and Smoke Control Systems Delegate Long, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0864 /CH0539 Energy Efficiency and Conservation Plans Delegate Crosby 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 539
Economic Matters
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1077 Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Climate Change Coordinator – Establishment Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1279 (SB1023) Maryland Building Performance Standards - Fossil Fuel Use, Energy Conservation, and Electric- and Solar-Ready Standards (Better Buildings Act of 2024) Delegate Boafo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1295 Real Property - Residential Rental Apartments - Air-Conditioning Requirements Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1463 (SB0848) Enoch Pratt Free Library - Capital Project Funding Delegate Edelson 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Appropriations
Appropriations
SB0848 (HB1463) Enoch Pratt Free Library - Capital Project Funding Senator Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0966 /CH0722 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 722
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB1023 (HB1279) Maryland Building Performance Standards – Fossil Fuel Use, Energy Conservation, and Electric– and Solar–Ready Standards (Better Buildings Act of 2024) Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/04/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:37 PM
Click to return on the top page