Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Heating and Cooling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0031 /CH0734 (SB0256/CH0735)
Title
Maryland Energy Administration – Resiliency Hub Grant Program and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 (SB0524)
Title
Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0248 (SB0302)
Title
Legionnaires' Disease Prevention Act
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0611 (SB0259/CH0051)
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0686
Title
Public Schools – Health and Safety – Carbon Dioxide Monitoring in Classrooms (Safe School Indoor Air Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0695 (SB0552)
Title
Environment – Climate Crisis Plan – Requirement (Better Together to Save Our Weather Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0729 (SB0471)
Title
Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0831
Title
Reducing Greenhouse Gas Emissions - Commercial and Residential Buildings
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0836 /CH0212 (SB0638)
Title
Public Schools - Student Athletics - Requirements and Emergency Action Plans (Elijah Gorham Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1165 (SB0588)
Title
Capital Projects - High Performance and Green Buildings
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1290 /CH0032
Title
Education - Public School Construction - Funding and Administration
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0184 /CH0123
Title
State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air–Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors – Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256 /CH0735 (HB0031/CH0734)
Title
Maryland Energy Administration – Resiliency Hub Grant Program and Fund
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0259 /CH0051 (HB0611)
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0471 (HB0729)
Title
Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0524 (HB0108)
Title
Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 /CH0038
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0588 (HB1165)
Title
Capital Projects - High Performance and Green Buildings
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0638 (HB0836/CH0212)
Title
Public Schools - Student Athletics - Requirements and Emergency Action Plans (Elijah Gorham Act)
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0966
Title
Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0031 /CH0734 (SB0256/CH0735) Maryland Energy Administration – Resiliency Hub Grant Program and Fund Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 734
Economic Matters
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0108 (SB0524) Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Economic Matters
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0248 (SB0302) Legionnaires' Disease Prevention Act Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0611 (SB0259/CH0051) Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0686 Public Schools – Health and Safety – Carbon Dioxide Monitoring in Classrooms (Safe School Indoor Air Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0695 (SB0552) Environment – Climate Crisis Plan – Requirement (Better Together to Save Our Weather Act of 2022) Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2022 - 11:00 AM
HB0729 (SB0471) Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0831 Reducing Greenhouse Gas Emissions - Commercial and Residential Buildings Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0836 /CH0212 (SB0638) Public Schools - Student Athletics - Requirements and Emergency Action Plans (Elijah Gorham Act) Delegate Lierman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1165 (SB0588) Capital Projects - High Performance and Green Buildings Delegate Forbes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1290 /CH0032 Education - Public School Construction - Funding and Administration Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 32
Appropriations
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0184 /CH0123 State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air–Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors – Sunset Extension Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0256 /CH0735 (HB0031/CH0734) Maryland Energy Administration – Resiliency Hub Grant Program and Fund Senator Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 735
Finance
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0259 /CH0051 (HB0611) Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability Senator Feldman 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 51
Finance
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0471 (HB0729) Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0524 (HB0108) Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing Senator Feldman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0528 /CH0038 Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022 Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 38
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0588 (HB1165) Capital Projects - High Performance and Green Buildings Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0638 (HB0836/CH0212) Public Schools - Student Athletics - Requirements and Emergency Action Plans (Elijah Gorham Act) Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (129-4)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0966 Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Alterations Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:30 PM
Click to return on the top page