Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Health Services Cost Review Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0565 /CH0770 (SB0514/CH0769)
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1375 /CH0798
Title
Health Information Exchanges - Electronic Health Information - Sharing and Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003 /CH0071 (HB0123/CH0070)
Title
Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0514 /CH0769 (HB0565/CH0770)
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0565 /CH0770 (SB0514/CH0769) Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 770
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1375 /CH0798 Health Information Exchanges - Electronic Health Information - Sharing and Disclosure Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 798
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2021 - 4:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0003 /CH0071 (HB0123/CH0070) Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021 Senator Griffith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0514 /CH0769 (HB0565/CH0770) Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 769
Finance
2/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:54 AM
Click to return on the top page