Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Health Care Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0184
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0570 (SB0487)
Title
Health Maintenance Organizations - Payments to Nonparticipating Providers - Reimbursement Rate
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887 /CH0795 (SB0694/CH0794)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Health Commissions and Maryland Insurance Administration - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0932 /CH0847 (SB0791/CH0848)
Title
Health Insurance - Utilization Review - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1051 /CH0799 (SB1059/CH0798)
Title
Maternal Health – Assessments, Referrals, and Reporting (Maryland Maternal Health Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate White Holland
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1122 /CH0817 (SB1000/CH0816)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission – Nursing Homes – Acquisitions
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1123
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission – Health Care Facilities – Cybersecurity for Hospitals
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1143 /CH0844
Title
Emergency Medical Services - Maryland Emergency Department Wait Time Reduction Commission - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1333 /CH0787
Title
Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity and Commission on Public Health - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1388 /CH0378 (SB1182)
Title
Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses for Veterinary and Health Care Professionals and Study of the Health Care Market
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0487 (HB0570)
Title
Health Maintenance Organizations - Payments to Nonparticipating Providers - Reimbursement Rate
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0694 /CH0794 (HB0887/CH0795)
Title
Maryland Department of Health – Health Commissions and Maryland Insurance Administration – Study
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 /CH0848 (HB0932/CH0847)
Title
Health Insurance - Utilization Review - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000 /CH0816 (HB1122/CH0817)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Nursing Homes - Acquisitions
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1006
Title
Hospitals - Medical Debt Collection - Sale of Patient Debt
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1059 /CH0798 (HB1051/CH0799)
Title
Maternal Health – Assessments, Referrals, and Reporting (Maryland Maternal Health Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1092 /CH0719
Title
Emergency Services - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0184 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0570 (SB0487) Health Maintenance Organizations - Payments to Nonparticipating Providers - Reimbursement Rate Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0887 /CH0795 (SB0694/CH0794) Maryland Department of Health - Health Commissions and Maryland Insurance Administration - Study Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 795
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0932 /CH0847 (SB0791/CH0848) Health Insurance - Utilization Review - Revisions Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 847
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1051 /CH0799 (SB1059/CH0798) Maternal Health – Assessments, Referrals, and Reporting (Maryland Maternal Health Act of 2024) Delegate White Holland 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 799
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1122 /CH0817 (SB1000/CH0816) Maryland Health Care Commission – Nursing Homes – Acquisitions Delegate Kerr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 817
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1123 Maryland Health Care Commission – Health Care Facilities – Cybersecurity for Hospitals Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Health and Government Operations
HB1143 /CH0844 Emergency Medical Services - Maryland Emergency Department Wait Time Reduction Commission - Establishment Delegate Bhandari 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 844
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1333 /CH0787 Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity and Commission on Public Health - Revisions Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 787
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1388 /CH0378 (SB1182) Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses for Veterinary and Health Care Professionals and Study of the Health Care Market Delegate Hill 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 378
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0487 (HB0570) Health Maintenance Organizations - Payments to Nonparticipating Providers - Reimbursement Rate Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Finance
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0694 /CH0794 (HB0887/CH0795) Maryland Department of Health – Health Commissions and Maryland Insurance Administration – Study Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 794
Finance
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0791 /CH0848 (HB0932/CH0847) Health Insurance - Utilization Review - Revisions Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 848
Finance
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1000 /CH0816 (HB1122/CH0817) Maryland Health Care Commission - Nursing Homes - Acquisitions Senator Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 816
Finance
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB1006 Hospitals - Medical Debt Collection - Sale of Patient Debt Senator Hayes 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (114-20)
Finance
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB1059 /CH0798 (HB1051/CH0799) Maternal Health – Assessments, Referrals, and Reporting (Maryland Maternal Health Act of 2024) Senator Ellis 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 798
Finance
3/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB1092 /CH0719 Emergency Services - Funding Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 719
Budget and Taxation
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:41 PM
Click to return on the top page