Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Health Care Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0028 /CH0744 (SB0005/CH0745)
Title
Public Health – Implicit Bias Training and the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0309 /CH0761 (SB0565/CH0762)
Title
Public Health - Data - Race and Ethnicity Information
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0565 /CH0770 (SB0514/CH0769)
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0936
Title
Hospitals and Freestanding Medical Facilities - Closing or Partial Closing - Public Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1022 /CH0790 (SB0748/CH0791)
Title
Public Health - State Designated Exchange - Clinical Information
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1375 /CH0798
Title
Health Information Exchanges - Electronic Health Information - Sharing and Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003 /CH0071 (HB0123/CH0070)
Title
Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0005 /CH0745 (HB0028/CH0744)
Title
Public Health - Implicit Bias Training and the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0299 /CH0723 (HB0548/CH0722)
Title
Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training (Healing Maryland's Trauma Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0514 /CH0769 (HB0565/CH0770)
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0565 /CH0762 (HB0309/CH0761)
Title
Public Health - Data - Race and Ethnicity Information
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0748 /CH0791 (HB1022/CH0790)
Title
Public Health – State Designated Exchange – Clinical Information
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0796
Title
Maryland Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities and Maryland Health Care Commission – Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837
Title
Health - Advance Care Planning and Advance Directives
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0028 /CH0744 (SB0005/CH0745) Public Health – Implicit Bias Training and the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 744
Health and Government Operations
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB0309 /CH0761 (SB0565/CH0762) Public Health - Data - Race and Ethnicity Information Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 761
Health and Government Operations
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0565 /CH0770 (SB0514/CH0769) Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 770
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0936 Hospitals and Freestanding Medical Facilities - Closing or Partial Closing - Public Notice Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1022 /CH0790 (SB0748/CH0791) Public Health - State Designated Exchange - Clinical Information Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 790
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1375 /CH0798 Health Information Exchanges - Electronic Health Information - Sharing and Disclosure Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 798
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2021 - 4:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0003 /CH0071 (HB0123/CH0070) Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021 Senator Griffith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0005 /CH0745 (HB0028/CH0744) Public Health - Implicit Bias Training and the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities Senator Griffith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 745
Finance
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
SB0299 /CH0723 (HB0548/CH0722) Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training (Healing Maryland's Trauma Act) Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 723
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0514 /CH0769 (HB0565/CH0770) Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 769
Finance
2/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0565 /CH0762 (HB0309/CH0761) Public Health - Data - Race and Ethnicity Information Senator Griffith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 762
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0748 /CH0791 (HB1022/CH0790) Public Health – State Designated Exchange – Clinical Information Senator Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 791
Finance
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0796 Maryland Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities and Maryland Health Care Commission – Reporting Requirements Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0837 Health - Advance Care Planning and Advance Directives Senator Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Finance
3/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:54 AM
Click to return on the top page