Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Health Benefit Exchange

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0517 (SB0460)
Title
Consumer Health Access Program for Mental Health and Addiction Care - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0709 (SB0632/CH0483)
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Small Business and Nonprofit Health Insurance Subsidies Program - Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0937 /CH0056 (SB0890)
Title
Abortion Care Access Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0952
Title
Access to Abortion Care and Health Insurance Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1035 (SB0728)
Title
Health Insurance - Qualified Resident State Subsidy Program (Access to Care Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0460 (HB0517)
Title
Health - Insurance Coverage Information
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0632 /CH0483 (HB0709)
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Small Business and Nonprofit Health Insurance Subsidies Program - Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0728 (HB1035)
Title
Health Insurance – Qualified Resident State Subsidy Program (Access to Care Act)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0890 (HB0937/CH0056)
Title
Abortion Care Access Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0517 (SB0460) Consumer Health Access Program for Mental Health and Addiction Care - Establishment Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0709 (SB0632/CH0483) Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Small Business and Nonprofit Health Insurance Subsidies Program - Workgroup Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2022 - 1:30 PM
Rules
HB0937 /CH0056 (SB0890) Abortion Care Access Act Delegate Kelly 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 56
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB0952 Access to Abortion Care and Health Insurance Act Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1035 (SB0728) Health Insurance - Qualified Resident State Subsidy Program (Access to Care Act) Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0460 (HB0517) Health - Insurance Coverage Information Senator Augustine 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2022 - 12:00 PM
SB0632 /CH0483 (HB0709) Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Small Business and Nonprofit Health Insurance Subsidies Program - Workgroup Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Finance
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0728 (HB1035) Health Insurance – Qualified Resident State Subsidy Program (Access to Care Act) Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0890 (HB0937/CH0056) Abortion Care Access Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Finance
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 3:17 PM
Click to return on the top page