Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Harford County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0456 (SB0386)
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Members - Voting Rights and Participation in Executive Sessions
Sponsor
Delegate Fair
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0552 /CH0586 (SB0672/CH0585)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Automated Enforcement Citations and Notices - Mailing Addresses
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560
Title
Harford County Board of Education - Appointed Members - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0621 /CH1008
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Annual Fee
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0623 (SB0735)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0632 /CH1009 (SB0736/CH1010)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Golf Simulator Facility
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0635 /CH1011 (SB0734/CH1012)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Performing Arts Nonprofit Organization License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0944
Title
Cecil County and Harford County - Outdoor Seating at Restaurants, Breweries, and Bars
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1001
Title
Motor Vehicles - Automated Enforcement Programs - Privacy Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1118 /CH1030 (SB0933/CH1031)
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Performing Arts Theater License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1345 (SB0737/CH0276)
Title
Higher Education - Harford Community College Board of Trustees - Alterations
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0143 /CH0065
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386 (HB0456)
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Members - Voting Rights and Participation in Executive Sessions
Sponsor
Senator Lewis Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0672 /CH0585 (HB0552/CH0586)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Automated Enforcement Citations and Notices - Mailing Addresses
Sponsor
Senator Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0734 /CH1012 (HB0635/CH1011)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Performing Arts Nonprofit Organization License
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0735 (HB0623)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L License
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0736 /CH1010 (HB0632/CH1009)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Golf Simulator Facility
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737 /CH0276 (HB1345)
Title
Higher Education - Harford Community College Board of Trustees - Alterations
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0933 /CH1031 (HB1118/CH1030)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Performing Arts Theater License
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0456 (SB0386) County Boards of Education - Student Members - Voting Rights and Participation in Executive Sessions Delegate Fair 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
HB0552 /CH0586 (SB0672/CH0585) Vehicle Laws - Automated Enforcement Citations and Notices - Mailing Addresses Delegate Boyce 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 586
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0560 Harford County Board of Education - Appointed Members - Alterations Delegate Johnson, A. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0621 /CH1008 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Annual Fee Harford County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1008
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0623 (SB0735) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L License Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0632 /CH1009 (SB0736/CH1010) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Golf Simulator Facility Harford County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1009
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0633 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0635 /CH1011 (SB0734/CH1012) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Performing Arts Nonprofit Organization License Harford County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1011
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0944 Cecil County and Harford County - Outdoor Seating at Restaurants, Breweries, and Bars Delegate Griffith 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB1001 Motor Vehicles - Automated Enforcement Programs - Privacy Protections Delegate Love 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1118 /CH1030 (SB0933/CH1031) Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Performing Arts Theater License Harford County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1030
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1345 (SB0737/CH0276) Higher Education - Harford Community College Board of Trustees - Alterations Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/27/2024 - 12:00 PM
SB0143 /CH0065 Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment Senator Gallion 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Budget and Taxation
1/25/2024 - 9:30 AM
Appropriations
3/20/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0386 (HB0456) County Boards of Education - Student Members - Voting Rights and Participation in Executive Sessions Senator Lewis Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0672 /CH0585 (HB0552/CH0586) Vehicle Laws - Automated Enforcement Citations and Notices - Mailing Addresses Senator Charles 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 585
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/03/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0734 /CH1012 (HB0635/CH1011) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Performing Arts Nonprofit Organization License Harford County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1012
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0735 (HB0623) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L License Harford County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
SB0736 /CH1010 (HB0632/CH1009) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Golf Simulator Facility Harford County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1010
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0737 /CH0276 (HB1345) Higher Education - Harford Community College Board of Trustees - Alterations Harford County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0933 /CH1031 (HB1118/CH1030) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Performing Arts Theater License Harford County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1031
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:52 PM
Click to return on the top page