Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Harford County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0334
Title
Harford County Board of Education - Alterations, Vacancy Procedures, and Funding for Independent Positions
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0336
Title
Harford County - County Superintendent - Election and Recall Procedures and Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 /CH0217
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0465 /CH0754 (SB0482)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0493 /CH0756 (SB0481)
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Service Under Stadium License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0520 (SB0483)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Annual Fee
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0599
Title
Harford County – Board of Education – Limitations on Virtual Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603 /CH0569
Title
Harford County Board of Education - Appointment of Members - Alterations
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0667 /CH0757
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses - Restaurants
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1225
Title
Education – Harford County Public Library – Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243
Title
Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0102
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Beer to Retail Dealer
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0481 (HB0493/CH0756)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Service Under Stadium License
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0482 (HB0465/CH0754)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0483 (HB0520)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Annual Fee
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0642 /CH0379
Title
Harford County - Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0908
Title
Harford County Board of Education - Appointment of Members - Alterations
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L License
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0334 Harford County Board of Education - Alterations, Vacancy Procedures, and Funding for Independent Positions Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0336 Harford County - County Superintendent - Election and Recall Procedures and Compensation Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0355 /CH0217 Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0465 /CH0754 (SB0482) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License Harford County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 754
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0493 /CH0756 (SB0481) Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Service Under Stadium License Harford County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 756
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0520 (SB0483) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Annual Fee Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0599 Harford County – Board of Education – Limitations on Virtual Meetings Delegate Griffith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/17/2022 - 3:00 PM
HB0603 /CH0569 Harford County Board of Education - Appointment of Members - Alterations Harford County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 569
Ways and Means
2/17/2022 - 3:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0667 /CH0757 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses - Restaurants Harford County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 757
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0797 County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1225 Education – Harford County Public Library – Collective Bargaining Delegate Johnson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1243 Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0102 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Beer to Retail Dealer Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0481 (HB0493/CH0756) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Service Under Stadium License Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0482 (HB0465/CH0754) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0483 (HB0520) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Annual Fee Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0642 /CH0379 Harford County - Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems Senator Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0908 Harford County Board of Education - Appointment of Members - Alterations Harford County Senators 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB1000 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L License Harford County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:31 PM
Click to return on the top page